Silaev v. Swiss-America Trading Corporation

Plaintiff: Serguei Silaev
Defendant: Swiss-America Trading Corporation
Case Number: 2:2014cv02551
Filed: November 18, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend the judgment 58 is denied; Defendant's motion for sanctions 55 is denied; Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a sur-reply to the motion for sanctions 68 is also denied; Defendant's motion for attorney fees and nontaxable expenses 54 is granted; Defendant is awarded $99,956.00 in fees and $497.18 in nontaxable costs for a total award of $100,453.18. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/30/17. (REW)
September 9, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 48 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. 42 ), is GRANTED, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and against Pl aintiff; counsel for Plaintiff must furnish his client, Mr. Silaev, with a copy of this Order. Counsel shall, within fourteen days of judgment, file an affidavit with the Court attesting to compliance; and Defendant has fourteen days from entry of judgment to file a motion to recover fees and costs. Defendants motion, regardless of the theory of recovery it advances, shall comply with the requirements set forth in the Court's April 22, 2015, Scheduling Order. (Doc. 32 at 6-7). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/9/16. (KGM)
September 8, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. 42 ), is GRANTED, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff; counsel for Plaintiff must furnish his client, Mr. Silaev, with a copy of this Order. Counsel shall, within fourteen days of judgment, file an affidavit with the Court attesting to compliance; and Defendant has fourteen days from entry of judgment to file a motion to recover fees and costs. Defendant's motion, regardless of the theory of recovery it advances, shall comply with the requirements set forth in the Court's April 22, 2015, Scheduling Order. (Doc. 32 at 6-7). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/8/16.(KGM)
July 22, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendant's Stipulated Motion to Transfer and Consolidate 35 is denied; a copy of this Order shall be filed in Case Nos. CV 14-2551-PHX-JAT, CV 14-2552-PHX-ROS, and CV 14-2553-PHX-HRH. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/21/15. (Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-02551-JAT, 2:14-cv-02552-ROS, 2:14-cv-02553-HRH) (REW)
March 31, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss is granted; Counts 1, 4 and 5 are dismissed without prejudice. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/31/2015.(TLB)
February 19, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant shall file a second supplement to the Notice of Removal properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction by February 25, 2015 or this case will be remanded to State Court. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/19/2015. (LFIG)
December 16, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, by 12/30/14, Defendant shall file a supplement to the notice of removal properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction, or this case will be remanded for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction; within 30 days of the notice of removal, Plaintiff may move to remand because a resident defendant cannot remove a case to federal court based on diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/16/14. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silaev v. Swiss-America Trading Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serguei Silaev
Represented By: Scott G Hunziker
Represented By: Chad Alan Schaub
Represented By: Michael Shane Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiss-America Trading Corporation
Represented By: Mark D Bogard
Represented By: Kraig J Marton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?