Micolo v. Pinal, County of et al

Plaintiff: Michael Carmine Micolo
Defendant: Pinal, County of, Pinal County Sheriff's Office and Stacy Sherwood
Case Number: 2:2014cv02649
Filed: December 8, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's second amended complaint (Doc. 62 ) is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff may not file another complaint in this case. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/20/16. (LAD)
March 22, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to amend (Doc. 59 ) is granted. Plaintiff's amended complaint (Doc. 60 ) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint by April 15, 2016. If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint by that date, the Clerk is directed to terminate this matter without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/22/16. (KGM)
March 10, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's date for filing an amended complaint is extended until March 18, 2016. Plaintiff is cautioned, however, that this case will be dismissed if he does not file an amended complaint by that date. The Clerk shall dismiss this action if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by March 18, 2016,without further order of the court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/9/16.(LSP)
February 16, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 48 ) is granted. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by March 11, 2016. Clerk is directed to terminate this matter without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint. See document for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/16/16. (EJA)
December 16, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Plaintiff's Motion to Add Defendant and Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/16/15. (EJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micolo v. Pinal, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinal, County of
Represented By: Amy Lynn Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinal County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Amy Lynn Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Sherwood
Represented By: Amy Lynn Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carmine Micolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?