Shaka v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Unknown Shaka
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Anthony N Medel, Richard Pratt and Lori Johnson
Case Number: 2:2015cv00050
Filed: January 12, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion for Reconsideration. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/9/2015.(LMR)
June 22, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. 10 ) and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must make an entry on the docket stating that th e dismissal for failure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/22/15. (KGM)
May 12, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Shaka. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/11/15. (LSP)
February 13, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 is denied without prejudice; within 30 days, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Fo rma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement; if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/13/15. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaka v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unknown Shaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony N Medel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?