Preayer v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Roger Wayne Preayer
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Unknown Schuster, Unknown Nalysa, Unknown Pillar, Carey Tucker, M L Ohsheta and Chris Moody
Case Number: 2:2015cv00069
Filed: January 15, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Mohave
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2017 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 132 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/30/2017.(TCA)
October 3, 2016 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 110 Defendants Arreola and Barajas' Joinder Motion and granting 92 Defendant Tucker's Motion for Summary Judgment. The claim against Tucker in Count II is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust admi nistrative remedies. The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to 92 Defendant Tucker's Motion for Summary Judgment and 110 Defendants Arreola and Barajas' Joinder Motion. Tucker is dismissed as a Defendant. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/3/16. (DXD)
September 23, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants'Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 71 ), Preayer's Objection to the Motion for Summary Judgment as Premature (Doc. 73 ), and Preayer's Motion to Strike Portio ns of Defendants Statement of Facts (Doc. 84 ). Preayer's Objection to the Motion for Summary Judgment as Premature (Doc. 73 ) and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Statement of Facts (Doc. 84 ) are denied. Defendants' Motio n for Summary Judgment (Doc. 71 ) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) the Motion is granted as to Ohshita, and the Eighth Amendment claim against her is dismissed with prejudice: and (b) the Motion is otherwise denied. (4) Ohshita is dismissed as a Defendant. The remaining claims are the Eighth Amendment claims in Count I against Schuster, Malysa, Piller, Barajas, and Arreola, and Count II against Tucker. Having chosen to file a fully-briefed motion for summary judgment on the Count I Eighth Amendment claims against Schuster, Malysa, and Piller, Defendants may not file another Rule 56 motion on these claims against these Defendants. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/22/2016. (REK)
April 7, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) granting 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Defendants Ryan and Moody are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. 1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Schuster, Nalysa, Pillar, Ohsheta, and Tucker. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/6/2015. (see PDF for further details) (ACL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preayer v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Wayne Preayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nalysa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pillar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M L Ohsheta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?