American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties et al

Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona and American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego and Imperial Counties
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, United States Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv00247
Filed: February 11, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2018 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: To the extent Defendants have not already submitted to Plaintiffs revised or supplemented Declarations pursuant to the Court's Order (Doc. 76 at 8-15), or revised Vaughn Indices pursuant to the same Order (Doc. 76 at 19-20, 22, 25- 26), Defendants shall submit to Plaintiffs the required revisions and/or supplements by June 4, 2018, and Defendants shall file with the Court a Notice of Compliance the same day. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, as discussed in more detail in this Ord er, the parties shall each file a brief not to exceed five pages by June 4, 2018, addressing the requirements for filing on the public docket the information provided pursuant to a FOIA request. No responses or replies are permitted. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/23/2018. (REK)
March 22, 2018 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration 77 is granted in part and denied in part. The Court agrees is erred when it stated that a protective order would be appropriate under FOIA to keep disclosure of the employees' names private. H owever, upon review of the parties' more extensive briefing, the Court still finds that the requested employees' names are not exempt from disclosure under FOIA Exemptions 6 or 7(C), and Defendants must therefore disclose the requested name s. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendants a stay of 60 days from the date of this Order to comply with this Order. This stay applies only to the disclosures addressed in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report 60 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/22/2018. (REK)
August 14, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and 62 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting each party leave to re-file abbreviated and non-duplicative motions for summary judgment as set forth in this Order, if necessary. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/14/17.(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona
Represented By: Mitra Ebadolahi
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: David Loy
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Aarti G Reddy
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego and Imperial Counties
Represented By: Mitra Ebadolahi
Represented By: Victoria Lopez
Represented By: David Loy
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Aarti G Reddy
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?