Sherrod v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Roosevelt Marquize Sherrod
Defendant: Charles L Ryan and Richard Pratt
Case Number: 2:2015cv00296
Filed: February 18, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED construing Plaintiff's "Notice of Conflict" (Doc. 69 ) as a request for the disqualification of the undersigned Magistrate Judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's request for disqualification of the undersigned Magistrate Judge (Doc. 69 ). (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/13/17. (LAD)
November 4, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiff's "Injunction for Organization" (Doc. 61 ) as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 11/04/2016. (REK)
September 20, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiff's "Recommendation for Rule 35. Garcia Laboratory Results" (Doc. 59 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's "Request for Rule 35 Physical and Mental Examination" (Doc. 65 ) . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's "Memorandum of Law In Support of Appointment of Counsel" (Doc. 64 ), which is docketed as a motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fourteen days from the filing of this Order, Defendant Ryan shall respond to Plaintiff's "Injunction for Organization" (Doc. 61 ), which the Court construes as a request for injunctive relief for the return of Plaintiff's legal documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail to Plaintiff a copy of his "Motion: to Amend Complaint" (Doc. 46 ) and all exhibits attached. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/19/16. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherrod v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Marquize Sherrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?