SolarCity Corporation v. Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District

Plaintiff: SolarCity Corporation
Defendant: Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
Case Number: 2:2015cv00374
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2017 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 268 Motion to Seal. The Clerk of Court shall file under seal Exhibits 2 and 3 (lodged at Doc. 271-2 and 271-3) and Plaintiff's Motion and SSUF (lodged Docs. 276 and 277 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part 295 M otion to Seal as follows: (1) Defendant's motion to seal Exhibits 1, 4-20, and 22 (lodged at Doc. 271-1, 272-4 through 271-11, 272-1 through 272-9, 272-11) is denied. Within 10 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall publicly file u nredacted versions of these exhibits. (2) Defendant's motion to seal Exhibit 21 (lodged at 272-10) is granted in part. The Clerk shall file Exhibit 21 under seal, but within 10 days of the date of this order Plaintiff shall publicly file a re vised version of Exhibit 21 that redacts only customer names. FURTHER ORDERED that, within 10 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall publicly file a revised version of its Motion and SSUF that redacts only the information the Court has ordered to be sealed. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/8/17. (MAP)
September 20, 2016 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 148 Motion to Stay. All further proceedings in this matter are stayed pending resolution of the District's interlocutory appeal before the Ninth Circuit. All deadlines in this matter are vacated. FURTHER ORDERED denying 151 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying 152 Motion to Seal Document; denying 161 Motion to Seal Document; denying 167 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/19/16. (MAP)
December 21, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the District's 82 Motion for Certification under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b), and 83 Motion to Stay. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/21/2015. (MMO)
October 27, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part the District's 53 Motion to Dismiss; granting the Association's 52 Motion to Dismiss; and granting in part the District's 54 Request for Judicial Notice. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/27/2015. (MMO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SolarCity Corporation v. Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SolarCity Corporation
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Represented By: John F Cove, Jr.
Represented By: Roopali H Desai
Represented By: Karen L Dunn
Represented By: Steven C Holtzman
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Richard James Pocker
Represented By: Kieran P Ringgenberg
Represented By: Sean P Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
Represented By: Christopher E Babbitt
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Quintin Howard Cushner
Represented By: Eric J Mahr
Represented By: Jason M Porter
Represented By: Karl Michael Tilleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?