Chappell v. Ryan et al
Petitioner: Derek Don Chappell
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Ron Credio
Case Number: 2:2015cv00478
Filed: March 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: Within 21 days of the filing date of this Order, Respondents must: 1. file a Notice stating where a complete copy of Trial Exhibits 102, 103, 105, 106, 107, 108, 115, 135, 142, 150, 153, 258, 259, 262, 269, 298, 314, 321, 322, 323, 324, 325 , 326, 327, 329, 345, and 346, in State v. Chappell, No. CR2004-037319, have been docketed in this case; or 2. file a Notice with complete copies of any of the above Trial Exhibits that has not already been docketed in this case as part of the state court record; or 3. file a Notice explaining why a complete copy of any of the above Trial Exhibits, which has not already been docketed in this case, cannot be filed as part of the state court record filed in this case. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 9/19/2022. (RMW)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER - To ensure a complete review and adjudication of Claims Two, Three, and Five through Seven of Petitioner Derek Chappell's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Maricopa County Superior Court release Trial Exhibits 102, 103, 105, 106, 107, 108, 115, 135, 142, 150, 153, 258, 259, 262, 269, 298, 314, 321, 322, 323, 324, 325, 326, 327, 329, 345, and 346, from the 2007 jury trial in State v. Chappell, No CR2004-037319, to the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Arizona, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Arizona, send a copy of this Order to Jeff Fine, Clerk of the Maricopa County Superior Court, 201 West Jefferson Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/29/2022. (LAD)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 94 Chappell's Motion for Temporary Stay and Abeyance and for Authorization to Appear in Ancillary State-Court Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/1/17.(LSP)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Petitioner's 12 Motion for Order Precluding Defense Team from Contacting Victims (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 7/21/15.(CLB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chappell v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derek Don Chappell
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Represented By: Robin C Konrad(Designation Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment)
Represented By: Jon M Sands(Designation Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Lacey Stover Gard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Credio
Represented By: Lacey Stover Gard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?