Crestwood Capital Corporation v. Andes Industries Incorporated

Plaintiff: Crestwood Capital Corporation
Defendant: Andes Industries Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2015cv00600
Filed: April 3, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - EZconn Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 197 (redacted), Doc. 205 (sealed)) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that this case (No. CV-15-01810-PHX-NVW) is deconsolidated and final judgment is entered at this time. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment in favor of EZconn Corporation and against PCT International, Inc., and Andes Industries, Inc., and that PCT International, Inc., and Andes Industries, Inc., take nothing. The Clerk shall terminate this case. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 9/14/2017. (ATD)
September 5, 2017 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 122 ( 126 sealed) Crestwood Capital Corporation's, Devon Investment Inc.'s, and Preston Collection Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Crestwood Capital Corporation, Devon Investment Inc., and Preston Collection Inc. by September 15, 2017, lodge proposed forms of judgment with supporting memoranda that show how interest was calculated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after judgment is entered, Crestwood Capital Corporation, Devon Inv estment Inc., and Preston Collection Inc. may each file a bill of costs and apply for attorneys' fees and expenses pursuant to LRCiv 54.1, LRCiv 54.2, and Rule 54(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within the time therein provided. See attached Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/5/2017. (RMW)
August 30, 2017 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting EZconn Corporation's 155 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED this case is deconsolidated and final judgment is entered at this time. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment in No. CV-16-00508-PHX-NVW in favor of Plaintiff EZConn Corporation against Defendant PCT International, Inc., for: (1) the principal amount of $6,629,046.55, plus (2) pre-judgment interest to August 30, 2017, in the amount of $2,833,837.54 at the rate of 10% per annum simple interest, plus (3) post-judgment interest on $9,462,884.09, the sum of amounts (1) and (2), at the federal rate of 1.23% per annum from the date of entry of judgment, August 30, 2017, until paid. EZconn Corporation may file a bill of costs and apply for attorneys' fees and expenses within the time provided. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 8/30/2017. (ATD)
June 24, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to file the proposed First Amended Complaint (lodged as Doc. 72 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Polar Star Management Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 114, CV-15-02549) is granted. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed with p rejudice as to Polar Star Management Ltd. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Cheng-Sun Lans Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 133, CV-15-02549) is granted. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to Cheng Sun Lan. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant EZconn Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, VI, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI, and XII (Doc. 26, CV-15-01810) is granted in part and denied in part. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to EZconn except for Count IV fo r breach of contract and ount IX for breach of the implied duty of good faith and fair dealing. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant eGtran Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI, and XII (Doc. 28, CV-15-01810) is granted. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to eGtran. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Renewed Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery by Andes Industries, Inc., and PCT International, Inc. (Doc. 84 , CV-15-00600) and Cheng-Sun Lan's Motion to Strike Portions of Reply in Support of Renewed Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery or, Alternatively, for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Doc. 92 , CV-15-00600) are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/24/2016.(KMG)
June 22, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that EZconn Corporation's Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike Insufficient Defenses and Redundant, Immaterial, and Impertinent Matter (Doc. 91 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant PCT International, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses and Facts Pertaining to Affirmative Defenses (Doc. 83 at 621) are stricken pursuant to Rule 12(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6/22/16. (NKS)
October 16, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 10/14/15 order on the record that the parties submit a joint proposal regarding jurisdictional discovery is vacated. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Join Required Parties (Doc. 18 ) as presented is denied without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant file its response to the Complaint by 10/30/15. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/16/15. (NKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crestwood Capital Corporation v. Andes Industries Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crestwood Capital Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Tom King
Represented By: Greer Novalis Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andes Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Represented By: Scott Michael Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?