Haviland v. TD Ameritrade Incorporated

Plaintiff: Douglas A Haviland
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Incorporated
Counter_claimant: TD Ameritrade Incorporated
Counter_defendant: Douglas A Haviland
Case Number: 2:2015cv00611
Filed: April 6, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion for Reconsideration and order and Judgment of August 19, 2015, are vacated (Doc. 44 , 45 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Judgment of June 25, 2015, is reinstated (Doc. 30 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff Douglas A. Haviland and against Defendant TD Ameritrade, Inc., confirming the Arbitration Award to the extent, and only to the extent, that TD Ameritrade must continue to make good faith efforts to transfer to Havilan d a certificate recognizing ownership in his name of the 75,000 Bancorp X106 shares currently held by the Depository Trust Company. The Clerk shall terminate this case. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/12/16. (LAD)
August 10, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Douglas A. Haviland's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 31 ) is granted. The Clerk is to enter judgment in favor of Haviland and against Defendant TD Ameritrade, Inc., confirming the arbitrator's Award of March 11, 2015, in its entirety. The court's June 25, 2015 Order (Doc. 29 ) and Judgment (Doc. 30 ) are vacated. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/10/15.(KGM)
July 31, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that TD Ameritrade file by 08/07/15, a brief of no more than five pages explaining why the court should not grant Haviland's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 31 ). See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/31/15. (NKS)
June 25, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant TD Ameritrade Inc.'s Motion to Vacate the FINRA Arbitration Award (Doc. 14 ) is denied. Plaintiff Douglas A. Haviland's Motion to Confirm FINRA Arbitration Award (Doc. 1 ) is granted to the extent, and only to the exte nt, that TD Ameritrade must continue to make good faith efforts to transfer to Haviland a certificate recognizing ownership in his name of the 75,000 Bancorp X106 shares currently held by the Depository Trust Company. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Haviland and against TD Ameritrade, confirming the Award to the extent, and only to the extent, as stated above. The Clerk shall terminate this case. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 06/25/15. (ATD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haviland v. TD Ameritrade Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Incorporated
Represented By: Meridyth Marie Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: TD Ameritrade Incorporated
Represented By: Meridyth Marie Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Douglas A Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?