Cameron v. Avalon Mobility Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Dean G Cameron
Defendant: Avalon Mobility Incorporated, Brenda Huffman and Scott Huffman
Case Number: 2:2015cv00963
Filed: May 27, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2018 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Amend (Doc. 62 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall not enter judgment at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for Attorney's Fees (Doc. 64 ) is also DENIED [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/5/18. (MAW)
January 25, 2018 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Doc. 69 is deemed to be a notice of death of Scott Huffman. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to vacate the trial (Doc. 69 ) is denied as to Defendant Brenda Huffman. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial is vacated as to Defendant Avalon. The claims against defendant Avalon only are stayed and will be dismissed without further notice on March 25, 2018, unless the Court is advised that the bankruptcy stay has been lifted, or a request for a lifting of the bankruptcy stay has not been ruled upon by thebankruptcy court [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/25/18. (MAW)
August 21, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 45 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 47 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court shall not enter judgment at this time [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/21/17.(MAW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron v. Avalon Mobility Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean G Cameron
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Mobility Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?