Tohono O'odham Nation v. Ducey et al

Plaintiff: Tohono O'odham Nation
Defendant: Douglas A Ducey, Mark Brnovich and Daniel Bergin
Case Number: 2:2015cv01135
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1362
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2016 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 251 Motion for Sanctions; denying 253 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on 1/18/2017 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the issues contained in this order. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate a conference call (or dial-in number) for the telephonic hearing on 1/18/2017. The parties shall submit a joint memorandum on 1/13/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/19/2016.(DGC, nvo)
September 15, 2016 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 250 Stipulation: Nation's motion for summary judgment due 9/27/2016; response due 11/8/2016; reply due 12/5/2016; hearing 12/14/2016 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/15/2016. (DGC, nvo)
July 25, 2016 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 227 Brief (Non Appeal) filed by Tohono O'odham Nation, 228 Brief (Non Appeal) filed by Daniel Bergin. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/25/2016. (DGC, nvo)
June 21, 2016 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion to Compel. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/21/2016.(DGC, nvo)
March 30, 2016 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/30/2016.(DGC, nvo)
September 17, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants Ducey and Brnovich's motion to dismiss 49 is granted; Defendant Bergin's motion to dismiss 50 is granted with respect to count two and otherwise denied; the Nation's motion for preliminary injunction 3 is denied; the motions to seal filed by the parties 61 , 67 , 72 are granted; the Court will set a case management conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/16/15. (REW) *Modified on 9/18/2015 (SCH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tohono O'odham Nation v. Ducey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A Ducey
Represented By: Sara Jane Agne
Represented By: Thomas James Clees
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Heidi McNeil Staudenmaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Thomas K Chenal
Represented By: Karen J Hartman-Tellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bergin
Represented By: Matthew A Hoffman
Represented By: Patrick Irvine
Represented By: Timothy W Loose
Represented By: Matthew D McGill
Represented By: Doug C Northup
Represented By: Carrie Alane Pixler Ryerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tohono O'odham Nation
Represented By: Laura Lynn Berglan
Represented By: Kelly P Dunbar
Represented By: Jonathan Landis Jantzen
Represented By: Sonya L Lebsack
Represented By: Danielle Spinelli
Represented By: Seth P Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?