Poehler v. Fenwick et al

Plaintiff: Robin L Poehler
Defendant: Debra Fenwick and Cleaning Solution Service LLC
Counter_claimant: Cleaning Solution Service LLC and Debra Fenwick
Counter_defendant: Robin L Poehler
Case Number: 2:2015cv01161
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting the Joint Motion to Approve Settlement of FLSA Action 59 ; the District Court of Arizona hereby retains continuing and exclusive jurisdiction over the parties, their attorneys, and this action as may be necessary or appropriate to implement and/or enforce the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/19/16.(REW)
April 12, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 4/12/16. (JWS)
December 18, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Certify Class. Within 14 days of this order Defendants are directed to provide Plaintiff with the names and last known addresses of potential class members. Plaintiff shall then mail the revised notice and consent for m to potential class members. Defendants are further directed to post within 14 days of this order the revised notice at their office in Phoenix, Arizona, in a like manner and location as other legally-mandated notices are posted. The revised notice must remain posted for 60 days. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/18/15.(JWS)
November 19, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's counterclaims. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/19/2015. (ATD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poehler v. Fenwick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin L Poehler
Represented By: Jarrett Joshua Haskovec
Represented By: Kaitlyn Alissa Redfield-Ortiz
Represented By: Natalie Brooke Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Fenwick
Represented By: Erica Marie Fedon
Represented By: Jon Laurence Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaning Solution Service LLC
Represented By: Erica Marie Fedon
Represented By: Jon Laurence Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cleaning Solution Service LLC
Represented By: Erica Marie Fedon
Represented By: Jon Laurence Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Debra Fenwick
Represented By: Erica Marie Fedon
Represented By: Jon Laurence Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robin L Poehler
Represented By: Jarrett Joshua Haskovec
Represented By: Kaitlyn Alissa Redfield-Ortiz
Represented By: Natalie Brooke Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?