Realty Executives International Incorporated v. Lugo et al

Plaintiff: Realty Executives International Incorporated
Defendant: Otto E Lugo, Linda Bonarelli Lugo, Long Island Partners Incorporated and Huntington Homes Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2015cv01225
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the Defendants (Doc. 63 ) is granted and that Sal J. Rivera and the law firm of Rivera Law Group P.C. are withdraw as local counsel for the defendants. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/14/2016. (REK)
August 9, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Request for Default Judgment Hearing (Doc. 46 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Answer (Doc. 50 ) is denied. Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default (Doc. 48 ) is granted pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(c) and that the Clerk of the Court's Entry of Default (Doc. 45 ) is vacated as to all of the defendants. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/08/2016. (REK)
March 31, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default (part of Doc. 26 ) is granted as unopposed and the Clerk of the Court's Entry of Default (Doc. 19 ) as to all of the defendants is vacated in its entirety. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss this Action for Insufficient Service of Process and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (part of Doc. 26 ) is granted pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(5) to the extent that service of process on all of the defendants is quashed and that the plaintiff shall properly effectuate service of process on the defendants no later than April 29, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue (part of Doc. 26 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/31/2016. (REK)
October 15, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment and to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, Improper Venue and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 23 is stricken without prejudice to being re-filed in a manner that fully complies with this Order and the Court's Local Rules of Practice. Defendants shall, no later than 11/6/2015, either file their motion pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(c) and/or Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b) or a statement that they are not going to file any such motion. Plaintiff' s Motion for Default Judgment and Request for Default Judgment Hearing 22 is denied without prejudice to being properly re-filed, if appropriate, after any issues regarding the propriety of the entry of default, service of process, venue and personal jurisdiction are resolved by the Court. See order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/15/2015.(LMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realty Executives International Incorporated v. Lugo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realty Executives International Incorporated
Represented By: Garland Allen Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher David Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otto E Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Bonarelli Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Partners Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Homes Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?