Flores-Delgado v. Lynch

Petitioner: Gabriel Flores-Delgado
Respondent: Loretta Lynch, Jeh Johnson, Juan P Osuna, Jon Gurule, Chuck DeRosa, Bruce A Taylor and Richard A Phelps
Case Number: 2:2015cv01273
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Report and Recommendation is accepted (Doc. 29 ), Petitioner's objections (Docs. 34 , 35 ) are overruled, and the Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 18 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgm ent accordingly. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Expedited Release (Doc. 27 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Bond Hearing (Doc. 36 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Status (Doc. 37 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Decision Under 60 Day Rule (Doc. 38 ) is DENIED.. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/17/2016. (KMG)
January 6, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that to the extent the motions for extension of time (Docs. 31 and 32 ) seek an extension of time to file objections, they are granted. Petitioner shall file his objections to the Report and Recommendation by 02/01/16. To the extent the motions seek appointment of counsel, they are denied. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 1/6/16. (NKS)
July 8, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Transferring Action to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/08/2015. (Flores, E) [Transferred from caed on 7/9/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores-Delgado v. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gabriel Flores-Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Loretta Lynch
Represented By: Diana L Pauli
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeh Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Juan P Osuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jon Gurule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chuck DeRosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bruce A Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard A Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?