Pesqueira #126613 v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Eric Kevin Pesqueira
Defendant: Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2015cv01426
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER: That the Clerk of Court amend the Docket to reflect termination of Unknown Parties (named as: John/ Jane Does I-IV - Medical Staff at Eyman Complex ADOC) and Unknown Party (Named as John Doe X-Ray Tech at ASPC Florence SMU-1) as ordered by the Court on November 2, 2015 (Doc. 12 at 9). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 8/8/19. (GMP)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting/denying 180 Motion to Seal. ORDERED granting Motion to Seal Docs. 48-51, 53, 62, 67. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Motion to Seal Doc. 52. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court seal the following documents: 48 - 51 , 53 , 62 , 67 . Doc. 52 shall remain sealed.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/8/19. (MAP)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER - The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Sedlar's 165 Motion to Dismiss, and the Motion is denied. All other matters must remain with the Magistrate for disposition as appropriate. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/19. (MSA)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion Requesting an Extension of the Service Deadline as to Defendant Lisa Sedlar 155 is granted. The Court deems service executed November 7, 2018 as timely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 11/15/2018. (REK)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER - The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Lohr's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 118 ), and the Motion is granted. Plaintiff's claim against Defendant Lohr is dismissed as barred by the statute of limitations, and Defendant Lohr is dismissed from the action. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/18/18. (DXD)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying Plaintiff's "Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint" (Doc. 123 ), "Motion Requesting Court Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction" (Doc. 124 ), "Motion to Supplement Plaintiff's Motion Requ esting Court Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction" (Doc. 131 ), and "Motion for Leave of Court to Submit Two Extra Pages in his Second Amended Complaint" (Doc. 132 ). ORDERED denying as moot Plaintiff's "Motion Requesting Court Provide Service By USMS or By Publication" (Doc. 125 ). ORDERED granting Plaintiff's "Motion to Extend Time for Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint as to Defendant Sedlar Pursuant to Rule 4(m) Fed. R. Civ. P." (Doc. 129 ). FURTHER ORDERED extending the service deadline as to Defendant Sedlar to September 17, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 7/19/18. (EJA)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's "Motion Request Court Direct DOC Special Handling of Plaintiff's Grievance and Subsequent Appeals Related to Count III of the Second Amended Complaint" 56 and "Motion Asking Court to Help Plaintiff with Problem Accessing E-File Services" 60 , and the motions are denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/01/2017. (REK)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 30 ) and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 36 ), and the Motions are denied. Service on Defendant Sedlar (Doc. 23 ) is quashed, and the service deadline is extended for an additional sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. The Clerk's Entry of Default (Doc. 26 ) is set aside. All other matters in this action remain with the Magistrate Judge for disposition as appropriate.(See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/31/17. (LAD)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Defendants Ryan, Pratt, McKamey, Corizon, Sedlar, Reece, and Does I-IV are dismissed without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must file a Response to this Order that includes either (1) the name of the Defendant identified as "John Doe Nurse" or (2) an explanation of what Plaintiff has done to try to learn these Defendants' names, a description of what discovery Plaintiff would undertake to learn his name, and the identity of at least one p erson who could be served with discovery. If Plaintiff fails to file a Response within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/18/15. (LAD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pesqueira #126613 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Kevin Pesqueira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?