Greyhound Lines Incorporated v. Viad Corporation

Plaintiff: Greyhound Lines Incorporated
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Counter_claimant: Viad Corporation
Counter_defendant: Greyhound Lines Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2015cv01820
Filed: September 11, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court finds in favor of Viad and against GLI on GLI's claims for breach of contract, breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing, CERCLA, and the MTCA, and orders that GLI take nothing on those claims. The Court finds in fav or of GLI on Viad's counterclaim, and orders that Viad take nothing on the counterclaim. Motions for attorneys' fees, if any, shall be filed by June 30, 2017, and shall be limited to 17 pages, exclusive of attachments. Responses shall be filed by July 14, 2017, and shall be limited to 17 pages. Replies shall be filed by July 21, 2017, and shall be limited to 8 pages. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/30/17. (EJA)
November 21, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 72 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court will hold a status hearing on 12/2/2016 at 11:00 a.m. to determine the next step in this case and how best to bring it to resolution. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/21/2016.(DGC, nvo)
November 8, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 98 Order on Motion in Limine (to correct date of filing). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/8/2016. (DGC, nvo)
November 7, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/7/2016.(DGC, nvo)
September 8, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Discovery. Defendant Viad Corporation shall produce the documents in categories 2 and 5 to Greyhound on or before 9/12/2016. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/8/2016.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greyhound Lines Incorporated v. Viad Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greyhound Lines Incorporated
Represented By: Linda Catherine Beresford
Represented By: Suzanne Roy Varco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: Brian Andrew Cabianca
Represented By: Kerryn Leigh Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: Brian Andrew Cabianca
Represented By: Kerryn Leigh Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Greyhound Lines Incorporated
Represented By: Linda Catherine Beresford
Represented By: Suzanne Roy Varco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?