Aguayo v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Lucy M Aguayo
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 2:2015cv02224
Filed: November 5, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Lucy M. Aguayo's "Unopposed Petition for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act" (Doc. 30 ) is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded $7,668.00 pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, this award shall be payable to Plaintiff and is subject to offset to satisfy any pre-existing debt that Plaintiff owes the United States pursuant to Astrue v. Ratliff, 560 U.S. 586, 594 (2010). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 12/15/17. (LAD)
November 21, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Amend/Alter Judgment Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 59(e) (Doc. 26 ) is DENIED. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 11/21/17. (LAD)
March 24, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Commissioner's decision is VACATED and this matter is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings as set forth in this Order; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 3/24/2017. (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguayo v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy M Aguayo
Represented By: Elizabeth Oluwafunmi Ayodele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?