Prison Legal News v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: |
Prison Legal News |
Defendant: |
Charles L Ryan, Gail Rittenhouse, Jeff Hood, Alf Olson and Unknown Parties |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv02245 |
Filed: |
November 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Phoenix Division Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Roslyn O Silver |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 20, 2024 |
Filing
379
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees 365 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants shall pay Plaintiff $2,370,881.67 in attorneys fees and expenses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants shall pay Plaintiff $8,426.25 for costs as outlined in Plaintiff's Bill of Costs (Doc. 366 ). Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/19/2024. (REK)
|
January 26, 2023 |
Filing
362
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/26/2023. (REK)
|
January 24, 2020 |
Filing
325
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 315 Motion to Stay. The previous stay regarding delivery of the previously censored remains in place. The remaining portions of the Court's Order (Doc. 305 ) and the Clerk's Judgment (Doc. 306 ) shall be stayed pending the final resolution of Ninth Circuit Case No. 19-17449. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/23/20. (DXD)
|
September 4, 2019 |
Filing
293
ORDER denying Defendants' 272 Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS ORDERED no later than September 11, 2019, the parties shall file a joint statement regarding the status of this case. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/4/19. (CLB)
|
March 8, 2019 |
Filing
260
ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 233 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED PLN's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 235 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED no later than March 22, 2019, the parties shall each file a statement, of no more than three pages, containing the proposed language for final injunctive relief regarding the claims on which PLN has prevailed. FURTHER ORDERED Defendants' Motion to Strike (Doc. [ 253]) is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED PLN's Motion to Strike (Doc. 254 ) is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED Defendants' Motion to Strike (Doc. 257 ) is DENIED as moot. This matter is ready for trial. Accordingly, the Court enters the following orders: ORDERED all Motions in Limine are due August 29, 2019. FURTHER ORDERED the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order, if not already filed, is due September 27, 2019. FURTHER ORDERED a Final Pretrial Conference is set for October 18, 2019 at 2:00 PM. FURTHER ORDERED Jury Trial is set for October 24, 2019 at 8:30 AM. See document for full details and additional deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/8/2019. (RMV)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?