Bayer et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Plaintiff: Peter A Bayer and Renee L Bayer
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Aurora Loan Services LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2015cv02430
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs may assert the following alleged RESPA violations at trial: (1) Defendants process in responding to the QWR was not reasonable,(2) charges were not properly assessed, and (3) payments other than those constituting the $12,900 in arrearages that have been dismissed were not properly credited. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/22/2017. (TCA)
May 1, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 45 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration 48 is denied. The final pretrial conference set for 5/19/2017 will be held as scheduled. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/1/2017.(DGC, nvo)
March 27, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' motion for summary judgment 32 is granted as to Plaintiffs' first four arguments in support of Claims 1-4 and on Claims 5 and 7, and denied as to all remaining claims; Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiffs' 14 page memorandum objecting to Fay Janati's declaration as a violation of LR Civ 7.2(m)(2), 35 pgs. 11-26, is granted; a telephonic conference call is set for April 7, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. to set a trial date and schedule a final pretrial conference. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate a conference call to include counsel for all Defendants and the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/27/17. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayer et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter A Bayer
Represented By: Beth Findsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee L Bayer
Represented By: Beth Findsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Represented By: Sean Keenan McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Represented By: Sean Keenan McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?