McClure v. Country Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Benjamin McClure
Defendant: Country Life Insurance Company and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2015cv02597
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2017 333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c)(1), Exhibit No. 1 shall not be supplemented to add missing claims file records that were not timely disclosed, and there shall be no mention of records allegedly contained in the claims file that were not contained in the claims file timely produced by Defendants. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/28/2017. (MMO)
August 7, 2017 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying McClure's 205 Motion for Summary Judgment. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/7/2017. (MMO)
August 1, 2017 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 201 Motion for Summary Judgment. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/1/2017. (MMO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClure v. Country Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin McClure
Represented By: Steven Jay German
Represented By: Scott B Seymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?