Crook #103045 v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Jason Marlin Crook
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Leon Malachinski, Arlene McKamey, Kataushia Thomas, Brenda Rojas and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2015cv02610
Filed: December 22, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2018 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING 219 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (part of). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/27/18. (EJA)
March 5, 2018 219 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER: RECOMMENDED that the Court grant Plaintiff's "Motion to Dismiss a Defendant without Prejudice" (Doc. 213 ). FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Court dismiss without prejudice Defendant Cato from Pl aintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 89 ) for failure to serve pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). This Report and Recommendation is not an order that is immediately appealable to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Any notice of appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1) should not be filed until entry of the District Court's judgment. IT IS ORDERED granting in part and denying in part, as set forth herein, Defendants' "Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Re ply to Defendant's [sic] Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt.#214)" (Doc. 215 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (Doc. 218 ) as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 3/5/18. (EJA)
September 22, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's "Motion for Appointment of Counsel" (Doc. 29 ); granting Plaintiff's "Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Pleading previously filed on August 15, 2016." (Doc. 32 ). The C lerk of Court is directed to withdraw Plaintiff's "Motion for Leave to Add Supplemental Pleading" (Doc. 30 ); and denying without prejudice Plaintiff's "Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint to Add New Defendants and Counts" (Doc. 33 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/21/16.(KGM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crook #103045 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Marlin Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Malachinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene McKamey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kataushia Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?