Mozilla Corporation v. IO Phoenix One LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mozilla Corporation
Defendant: IO Phoenix One LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00383
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2016 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 12 Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
May 9, 2016 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mozilla Corporation. (Gaudette, Crystal)
April 13, 2016 11 Featured Case ORDER: IT IS ORDERED pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after May 12, 2016, unless before then Plaintiff has served Defendant with the Summons and Complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/13/16. (JAMA)
February 12, 2016 10 Summons Issued as to IO Phoenix One LLC. (HLA)*** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 11, 2016 9 Featured Case ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on defendants. (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/11/16. (JAMA)
February 11, 2016 8 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 11, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX168439 as to Asha R Subas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 11, 2016 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Asha R Subas on behalf of Mozilla Corporation. (BAS)
February 11, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX168440 as to Crystal M Gaudette. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 11, 2016 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Crystal M Gaudette on behalf of Mozilla Corporation. (BAS)
February 11, 2016 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Mozilla Corporation. (Farrell, Michael)
February 11, 2016 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mozilla Corporation. (Farrell, Michael)
February 11, 2016 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Mozilla Corporation. (KMG)
February 11, 2016 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12624153. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-00383-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KMG)
February 11, 2016 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12624153 filed by Mozilla Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (submitted by Michael Farrell)(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mozilla Corporation v. IO Phoenix One LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mozilla Corporation
Represented By: Michael J Farrell
Represented By: Crystal M Gaudette
Represented By: Asha R Subas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IO Phoenix One LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?