Starling v. Banner Health et al

Plaintiff: Mark Starling
Defendant: Banner Health, Marjorie J Bessel, Julie Nunley, Cindy Helmich, Lori Davis-Hill and Joseph Chatham
Case Number: 2:2016cv00708
Filed: March 15, 2016
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2018 318 Opinion or Order of the Court *AMENDED ORDER (to correct caption) - Amending Doc. 315 : Order re: 216 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Stan Smith, and 221 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Chester Flaxmayer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Banner He alth's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Stan Smith 216 is granted regarding Smith's report and testimony on hedonic damages. The motion is otherwise denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Banner Health's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Chester Flaxmayer 221 is granted. Please see attached Order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 2/21/2018. (RMW) Modified to add WO on 2/22/2018 (SLQ).
January 29, 2018 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 301 Defendant Banner Health's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's January 12, 2018 Ruling. See attached Order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 1/29/2018. (RMW)
January 12, 2018 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - No claims remain against Bessel, Nunley, Helmich, or Davis-Hill. Only Starlings ADEA age discrimination and ADEA retaliatory discrimination case against Banner will proceed. A final pretrial conference will be set by separate order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants Banner Health, Marjorie Bessel, M.D., Julie Nunley, Cindy Helmich, and Lori Davis-Hill's 218 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted regarding Counts III, IV, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX, X, and XI and denied regarding Counts I and II. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 243 Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) is denied. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 1/11/2018. (ATD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starling v. Banner Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Represented By: Erin A Hertzog
Represented By: Michael J Petitti
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie J Bessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Nunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Helmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Davis-Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Chatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?