Feldman et al v. Arizona Secretary of State's Office et al

Plaintiff: Leslie Feldman, Luz Magallanes, Mercedez Hymes, Julio Morera, Cleo Ovalle, Peterson Zah, Democratic National Committee, DSCC, Arizona Democratic Party, Kirkpatrick for U.S. Senate and Hillary for America
Defendant: Arizona Secretary of State's Office, Michele Reagan, Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, Denny Barney, Steve Chucri, Andy Kunasek, Clint Hickman, Steve Gallardo, Maricopa County Recorder and Elections Department, Helen Purcell, Karen Osborne and Mark Brnovich
Intervenor_plaintiff: Bernie 2016 Incorporated
Intervenor_defendant: Arizona Republican Party, Bill Gates, Suzanne Klapp, Debbie Lesko and Tony Rivero
Case Number: 2:2016cv01065
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2017 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 317 State Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Relevant Documents. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/24/2017. (MMO)
March 3, 2017 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 245 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint as follows: The Arizona Secretary of State's Office is hereby DISMISSED from this action; and The State Defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to join a party under Rule 19 otherwise is DENIED. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/3/2017. (MMO)
October 11, 2016 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 72 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Provisional Ballot Claims. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/11/2016. (MMO)
September 23, 2016 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Joint Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' ReplyMemorandum and Reply Exhibits filed by Defendants and the ARP, 167 , isDENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction of H.B. 2023, 84 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge Douglas L. Rayes on 9/23/16.(CLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feldman et al v. Arizona Secretary of State's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Feldman
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Magallanes
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedez Hymes
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Morera
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleo Ovalle
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peterson Zah
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSCC
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Democratic Party
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirkpatrick for U.S. Senate
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary for America
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Amanda R Callais
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Sarah Rae Gonski
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Secretary of State's Office
Represented By: James P Driscoll-MacEachron
Represented By: Karen J Hartman-Tellez
Represented By: Kara Karlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Reagan
Represented By: James P Driscoll-MacEachron
Represented By: Karen J Hartman-Tellez
Represented By: Kara Karlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph I Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denny Barney
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph I Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Chucri
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph I Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Kunasek
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph I Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Hickman
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph I Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Gallardo
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph I Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Recorder and Elections Department
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph I Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Purcell
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph I Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Osborne
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: Joseph I Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: James P Driscoll-MacEachron
Represented By: Karen J Hartman-Tellez
Represented By: Kara Karlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Bernie 2016 Incorporated
Represented By: Roopali H Desai
Represented By: David Andrew Gaona
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: Malcolm Seymour, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Arizona Republican Party
Represented By: Sara Jane Agne
Represented By: Joy Lisanne Isaacs
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Timothy Andrew LaSota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Bill Gates
Represented By: Sara Jane Agne
Represented By: Joy Lisanne Isaacs
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Timothy Andrew LaSota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Suzanne Klapp
Represented By: Sara Jane Agne
Represented By: Joy Lisanne Isaacs
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Timothy Andrew LaSota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Debbie Lesko
Represented By: Sara Jane Agne
Represented By: Joy Lisanne Isaacs
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Timothy Andrew LaSota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Tony Rivero
Represented By: Sara Jane Agne
Represented By: Joy Lisanne Isaacs
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Timothy Andrew LaSota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?