Miller #262220 v. Unknown Parties
Defendant: |
Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona |
Petitioner: |
Frederick Angus Miller, Jr. |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv01427 |
Filed: |
May 9, 2016 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Phoenix Division Office |
County: |
Pinal |
Presiding Judge: |
Bridget S Bade (PS) |
Presiding Judge: |
David G Campbell |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 5, 2018 |
Filing
52
ORDER: Judge Bade's R&R 43 is accepted. The petition for writ of habeas corpus 8 is denied. Respondents' motion to dismiss 34 is denied as moot. Petitioner's motion for further review 37 is granted for reasons stated by Judge B ade. Petitioner's motion for extension of time to file a reply 48 is denied. The motion suggests that Petitioner has not received legal materials after December 13, 2017, but the last filing in this case before the motion was on November 22, 2 017. 47 . What is more, a reply is unnecessary because Petitioner did not make any specific objections to the R&R, and the Court will not consider new arguments in a reply brief. Petitioner has also filed a motion suggesting that the place of his cu rrent incarceration is interfering with his access to court filings and otherwise mistreating him. (Docs. 49 , 51 ). The motion is denied. For reasons stated above, it does not identify any specific way in which the alleged interference has had a m aterial effect on this proceeding. And his alleged mistreatment is not a matter that can be raised in this habeas petition. A certificate of appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal are denied. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/05/2018. (REK)
|
December 2, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION accepting 17 Judge Bade's Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1 ) is denied, and a certificate of appealability is denied. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/2/16. (DXD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?