Zounds Hearing Franchising LLC et al v. Bower et al

Plaintiff: Zounds Hearing Franchising LLC and Zounds Hearing Incorporated
Defendant: Edward T Bower, Barbara Bower and Lend Me Your Ears Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2016cv01462
Filed: May 12, 2016
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Zounds Defendants' 43 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Mediation is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. CV-17-00728 is deconsolidated and the Clerk shall tra nsfer the case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment in consolidated Cases No. CV-16-01462, No. CV-16-01465, No. CV-16-01467, and No. CV-16-01470 declaring and adjudgin g as follows: 1. Section 22(C) of the Franchise Agreement is invalid and unenforceable to the extent it requires that mediation occur in Phoenix, Arizona as a condition precedent to the suit Defendants filed in Ohio because 2. The Ohio Business Opportunity Purchasers Protection Act, Ohio Rev. Code § 1334.06(e), provides that "any provision in an agreement restricting jurisdiction or venue to a forum outside of this state, or requiring the application of laws of an other state, is void with respect to a claim otherwise enforceable under [the Act]" and the claims the Franchisees filed in Ohio are claims under the Act, and 3. Section 22(A) of the Franchise Agreement providing that "[t]his agreemen t shall be governed by and construed in accordance with the laws of the State of Arizona" is invalid and unenforceable with respect to the claims and issues under the Ohio Business Opportunity Purchasers Protection Act that the Franchisees filed in Ohio. The Clerk shall terminate these cases in this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 9/19/2017. (ATD)
September 15, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Zounds Defendants' 43 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Mediation is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. CV-17-00728 is deconsolidated and the Clerk shall trans fer the case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment in consolidated Cases No. CV-16-01462, No. CV-16-01465, No. CV-16-01467, and No. CV-16-01470 declaring and adjudging as follows: 1. Section 22.C of the Franchise Agreement is invalid and unenforceable to the extent it requires that mediation occur in Phoenix, Arizona as a condition precedent to the suit Defendants filed in Ohio because 2. The Ohio B usiness Opportunity Purchasers Protection Act, Ohio Rev. Code § 1334.06(e), provides that "any provision in an agreement restricting jurisdiction or venue to a forum outside of this state, or requiring the application of laws of another s tate, is void with respect to a claim otherwise enforceable under [the Act]" and the claims Defendants filed in Ohio are claims under the Act, and 3. Section 22.A of the Franchise Agreement providing that "[t]his agreement shall be go verned by and construed in accordance with the laws of the State of Arizona" is invalid and unenforceable with respect to the claims and issues under the Ohio Business Opportunity Purchasers Protection Act that the Franchisees filed in Ohio. The Clerk shall terminate these cases in this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 9/15/2017. (ATD)
July 1, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case CV-16-01462-PHX-NVW is now consolidated with cases CV-16-01465-PHX-SRB, CV-01467-PHX-NVW, and CV-16-01470-DLR for all further proceedings pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Proce dure 42(a)(2). In accordance with LRCiv 42.1, all pleadings shall be filed in the lower numbered case. Therefore, future pleadings pertaining to any of these actions shall be filed in CV-16-01462-PHX-NVW and all cases are now assigned to the undersigned. (See document for details.) Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 06/30/2016. (Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-01462-NVW, 2:16-cv-01465-SRB, 2:16-cv-01467-NVW, 2:16-cv-01470-DLR) (ATD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zounds Hearing Franchising LLC et al v. Bower et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zounds Hearing Franchising LLC
Represented By: David P Brooks
Represented By: Spenser Whitney Call
Represented By: Frank A Reino
Represented By: Jeffrey Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zounds Hearing Incorporated
Represented By: David P Brooks
Represented By: Spenser Whitney Call
Represented By: Frank A Reino
Represented By: Jeffrey Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward T Bower
Represented By: Stanley M Dub
Represented By: Peter Neil Greenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Bower
Represented By: Stanley M Dub
Represented By: Peter Neil Greenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lend Me Your Ears Incorporated
Represented By: Stanley M Dub
Represented By: Peter Neil Greenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?