Continental Circuits LLC v. Intel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Continental Circuits LLC |
Defendant: |
Intel Corporation, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion and Ibiden Corporation Limited |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv02026 |
Filed: |
June 22, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Phoenix Division Office |
County: |
Maricopa |
Presiding Judge: |
David G Campbell |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 27, 2020 |
Filing
397
ORDER granting 387 , 391 , 394 Motions to Seal Document. The Clerk is directed to accept for filing under seal Docs. 389 , 390 , and 392 . The Clerk is further directed to maintain the numbering of the sealed documents as currently indicated on the docket. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 5/27/20. (MAP)
|
January 27, 2020 |
Filing
367
ORDER granting / denying in part 344 Motion to Compel FURTHER ORDERED granting 340 , 350 , 362 Joint Motions to Seal. The Clerk is directed to accept for filing under seal Docs. 341 , 351 , 363 and 364 . The Clerk is further directed to maintain the numbering of the sealed documents as currently indicated on the docket. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/27/20. (MAP)
|
December 16, 2019 |
Filing
353
ORDER re: 283 USCA Mandate, 325 Brief (Non Appeal) filed by Continental Circuits LLC, 324 Memorandum filed by Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Ibiden Company Limited, Intel Corporation. See Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/16/2019. (DGC, nvo)
|
August 9, 2017 |
Filing
243
ORDER re: 189 , 188 Markman Briefing and hearing. See Order for additional detail. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/9/2017. (DGC, nvo)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing
197
ORDER granting/denying in part 142 (redacted version), 147 (sealed version) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to State a Claim. The motion is granted as to Plaintiff's (a) direct infringement claims against Ibiden as to unna med products sold to customers other than Intel, (b) indirect infringement claims related to the unnamed Ibiden products intended for customers other than Intel, and (c) willfulness claims against both Defendants. The motion is denied as to Plaintiff's induced infringement claims against Intel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/16/17. (MAP)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing
112
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/21/2017.(DGC, nvo)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?