Chabrowski, et al v. Litwin et al
Plaintiff: Chabrowski, Derek Jahn Chabrowski and Northland Insurance Company
Defendant: Litwin, Marion Blonski, Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin, Roman Mozdyniewicz, Izabela Nordahl, California Department of Motor Vehicles, ABM Transport and Wieslaw Likus
Counter Defendant: Anna Chabrowski
Case Number: 2:2016cv03766
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MANDATE of USCA (19-16036) Dismissing re: #184 Notice of Appeal filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (GMP)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 USCA Appeal Fees received re: #184 Notice of Appeal filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski (19-16036). Filing Fee $ 505, receipt number PHX211649. (LAD)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER of USCA (19-16036) denying appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis re: #184 Notice of Appeal filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. Within 28 days, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docket fees. If petitioner does not comply, the appeal will be dismissed. (See document for further details). (LAD)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER of USCA (19-16036) that appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docket fees within 21 days and file proof of payment or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis re: #184 Notice of Appeal filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the clerk automatically for failure to prosecute. (See document for further details). (Attachments: #1 Form 4)(LAD)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 USCA Case Number re: #184 Notice of Appeal. Case number 19-16036, Ninth Circuit. (EJA)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #155 Minute Entry, #182 Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment, Order on Motion for New Trial, #183 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, #162 Clerks Judgment by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (LAD) (3 pages)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #179 Amended Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses. Defendant is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $57,532.50 and non-taxable costs in the amount of $5,996.40 against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/17/2019. (MMO)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER denying #170 Motion for Relief from Judgment, or in the Alternative Motion for New Trial. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/16/2019. (MMO)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #179 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 RESPONSE to Motion re: #179 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (DXD)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 AMENDED MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Consultation, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Fee Agreement/Recitation of Oral Fee Agreement, #3 Exhibit Task-Based Itemized Statement of Fees and Expenses, #4 Affidavit Affidavit Affidavit of Ted F. Stokes in Support of Motion)(Stokes, Theodore)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #175 Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses. Defendant shall file the amended motion by no later than 2/8/2019. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's amended motion for attorneys' fees within 14 days of the amended motion being filed. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/4/2019. (MMO)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL EXCERPTED TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 3 (TESTIMONY OF JAN LITWIN) proceedings held on 11/30/2018, before Judge DOUGLAS L. RAYES. [Court Reporter: Jennifer A. Pancratz, RMR, CRR, FCRR, CRC, Telephone number (602) 322-7198]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2019. (RAP)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL EXCERPTED TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 2 (TESTIMONY OF JAN LITWIN) proceedings held on 11/28/2018, before Judge DOUGLAS L. RAYES. [Court Reporter: Jennifer A. Pancratz, RMR, CRR, FCRR, CRC, Telephone number (602) 322-7198]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2019. (RAP)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION to Amend/Correct #168 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Proposed Amended Motion, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Stokes, Theodore)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #168 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (GMP)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #170 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment MOTION for New Trial filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- October 22, 2018 Email)(Stokes, Theodore)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Plaintiff's Separate List of Affidavits and Exhibits in Support of #170 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment, MOTION for New Trial by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 AFFIDAVIT in Support of: #170 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment MOTION for New Trial by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION for Relief from Judgment, MOTION for New Trial by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Derek Jahn Chabrowski. Reason for return: not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Document number #153 . (SLQ)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Consultation, #2 Exhibit Fee Agreement/Recitation of Oral Fee Agreement, #3 Exhibit Task-Based Itemized Statement of Fees and Expenses, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Ted F. Stokes in Support of Motion)(Stokes, Theodore)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thimothy Lake of Tharpe & Howell, LLP for proceedings held on 11/28/2018 and 11/30/2018, Judge Douglas L Rayes hearing judge(s). (RAP)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Anthony L. Hall, Esq. of Holland & Hart LLP for proceedings held on 11/30/2018, Judge Douglas L Rayes hearing judge(s). (RAP)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ORDER Re: EXHIBITS: Counsel/parties are directed to retain custody of the exhibits until the case has been completely terminated, including all appeals, pursuant to LRCiv 79.1. (MMO)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Minute Entry filed November 30, 2018, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff in the amount of $41,805.00. The complaint and action are dismissed. (REK)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Jury Questions. (MMO)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Juror Questions during Trial. (MMO)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Defendant's Exhibit List by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (REK)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Defendant's Witness List by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (REK)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Plaintiff's Witness List by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Final Jury Instructions. (REK)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Preliminary Jury Instructions. (REK)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Jury Trial (Day 3) completed on 11/30/2018. Jan Litwin testifies and Exhibit 62 marked and admitted for limited purpose. Closing arguments presented. Verdict for Defendant/Counter Claimant read on all claims. Jury is polled. The admonition is lifted and the jury is excused. The Court directs the Clerk to enter judgment according to the verdict and assess costs as ordered by law. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) See attached PDF for complete details. Hearing held 8:57 AM to 4:54 PM. (REK)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 *JURY VERDICT (redacted) *Modified to correct text of document attached; NEF regenerated on 12/03/2018 (REK)/(SCH).
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Sealed Verdict Forms. (cc: Pltf/Dft). (SLQ)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 DECLARATION of Paul Stanco by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Jury Trial (Day 2) held on 11/28/2018. Evidence entered. Trial will reconvene on 11/30/2018 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) See attached PDF for complete details. Hearing held 9:04 AM to 4:51 PM.(MMO)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Jury Trial (Day 1) begun on 11/27/2018. Voir Dire conducted and jury is sworn. Evidence entered. Trial will reconvene on 11/28/2018 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) See attached PDF for complete details. Hearing held 8:34 AM to 4:29 PM.(MMO)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Second Proposed Jury Instructions by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Plaintiff's Separate List of Exhibits to be Presented at Trial by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Amending Doc. #146 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/16/2018. Trial issues discussed. Plaintiff shall file with the Court his exhibit list by 5:00 PM on 11/19/18. Parties shall be present for trial at 8:30 AM on 11/27/2018. (See attached Minute Entry for details.) (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 2:30 PM to 3:17 PM.(MMO) Reason for Amendment: to reflect defendant will deliver exhibits morning of trial. (MMO)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 *AMENDED by Doc. #147 * MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/16/2018. Trial issues discussed. Plaintiff shall file with the Court his exhibit list by 5:00 PM on 11/19/18. Parties shall be present for trial at 8:30 AM on 11/27/2018. (See attached Minute Entry for details.) (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 2:30 PM to 3:17 PM.(MMO) Modified on 11/16/2018 (MMO).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Witness List by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2018 is VACATED AND RESET for 11/16/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Defense counsel Theodore Stokes shall be allowed to appear telephonically by calling chambers via a landline at 602-322-7530 prior to the scheduled hearing time. The use of a cellular phone will not be permitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Filing - Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Pre-Trial Order)(Stokes, Theodore)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 **Item Re-Filed at #143 **Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #119 Order(PROPOSED FINAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER) by Defendant Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore) *Modified text on 11/6/2018 (REK).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Proposed Verdict Form by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Witness List by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Proposed Jury Instructions by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Proposed Voir Dire by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Statement of the Case by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying Chabrowski's #122 Motion for Summary Judgment and #133 Motion for oral argument. FURTHER ORDERED reaffirming the pretrial deadlines contained in the Court's March 2, 2018 #119 Order Setting Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/9/2018. (MMO)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #133 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re: #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (GMP)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #133 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re: #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion/Request for Oral Argument on his Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION for Oral Argument in Support of #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (SLQ)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (EJA)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 DECLARATION of DECLARATION OF WLODZIMIERZ JAN LITWIN IN SUPPORT OF THE RESPONSIVE MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re: #129 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #130 Statement of Facts by Defendant Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Chabrowski Dep. Cited Excerpts)(Stokes, Theodore)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #129 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment Controverting Statements of Facts by Defendant Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RESPONSE to Motion re: #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #125 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant shall have until 4/18/2018 to file a response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/2/2018. (MMO)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting defendant's #125 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Written order to follow. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/30/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition to #125 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (EJA)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore) Modified on 4/2/2018 (MMO).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (193 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(REK)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 DECLARATION of Plaintiff Derek Chabrowski re: #122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (8 pages) (REK)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (3 pages) (REK)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #117 Order, Set Deadlines by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Plaintiff's Expert Witness Declaration filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Motions in Limine due by 10/16/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/5/2018. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/2/2018. (MMO)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonic Interim Scheduling Conference held on 3/1/2018. Status of discovery and dispositive motions discussed. Deadline for dispositive motions extended for 1 day, until 3/2/18. Jury Trial set for 4 days beginning 11/27/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Final pretrial conference set for 11/15/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 506. Order setting final pretrial conference and corresponding deadlines to issue. APPEARANCES: Pro Se Plaintiff Derek Chabrowski. Telephonic appearance by Ted Stokes for Defendant Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 4:40 PM to 4:56 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER that Plaintiff file, within fourteen (14) days, a memorandum showing cause why he should not be sanctioned for failing to appear. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/26/2018. (MMO)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER striking #88 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/23/2018. (MMO)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 2/22/2018 before Judge Douglas L Rayes: This is the time set for Telephonic Interim Scheduling Conference. Plaintiff not appearing, the hearing is reset. Telephonic Interim Scheduling Conference reset for 3/1/2018 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Ted Stokes for Defendant Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 4:48 PM to 4:50 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (EJA)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPLY re: #110 Response by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (EJA)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that no sanctions be imposed.(See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 2/9/18. (SLQ)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: of Service of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures on Plaintiff by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin . (Stokes, Theodore) *Modified to correct event on 2/9/2018 (REK).
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RESPONSE re: #109 Response to Order to Show Cause by Defendant Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #106 Minute Entry by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Interim Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2018 is vacated and reset. Telephonic Interim Scheduling Conference reset for 2/22/2018 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonin Discovery Hearing held on 1/26/2018. Discussion held re: length of deposition. Parties are advised to complete Mr. Chabrowski's deposition within the next hour. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Derek Chabrowski for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Ted Stokes for Defendant Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 2:49 PM to 2:53 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Discovery Hearing re: deposition set for 1/26/2018 at 02:50 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Settlement Conference held on 1/25/2018 and a settlement was not reached. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file, within fourteen (14) days, a Memorandum Showing Cause why he should not be sanctioned for appearing nearly an hour late for the Settlement Conference schedule for 1:30 p.m. on January 25, 2018. (Not Recorded) Hearing held 1:30 PM to 4:30 PM(REK)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 1/24/2018. After hearing from the parties, the Court rules as follows: Defendant shall be allowed to bank records on the ARTBE Chase account, the ARTBE BMO account, and the P&L MidFirst account. Further, Plaintiff shall produce checks from his personal accounts that were deposited into the ARTBE accounts or given to defendant. Plaintiff agrees his claims will be limited to those items produced. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Pro Se Plaintiff Derek Chabrowski. Telephonic appearance by Ted Stokes for Defendant. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 2:00 PM to 2:41 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 1/24/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Counsel for defendant is responsible for making the necessary arrangements for the conference call. All parties participating in the conference call shall do so via a landline only. The use of cellular phones will not be permitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 1/16/2018. After hearing from the parties, the Court orders the deposition of plaintiff to proceed as scheduled on 1/26/18. The Court further orders plaintiff's #97 Motion for Leave to File motion for protective order; motion to quash irrelevant subpoena(s); and motion to quash notice of deposition, and each attached motion, are DENIED for failure to comply with the Court's standing order to meet and confer. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Pro Se Plaintiff Derek Chabrowski. Telephonic appearance by Ted Stokes for Defendant. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 2:32 PM to 2:39 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 **DENIED per Doc. 101** LODGED Proposed Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition re: #97 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Quash Irrelevant Subpoena(s), and Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK) Modified on 1/17/2018 (MMO).
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 **DENIED per Doc. 101** LODGED Proposed Motion to Quash Irrelevant Subpoena(s) re: #97 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Quash Irrelevant Subpoena(s), and Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK) Modified on 1/17/2018 (MMO).
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 **DENIED per Doc. 101** LODGED Proposed Motion for Protective Order re: #97 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Quash Irrelevant Subpoena(s), and Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK) Modified on 1/17/2018 (MMO).
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Protective Order, Motion to Quash Irrelevant Subpoena(s), and Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 1/16/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Counsel for defendant is responsible for making the necessary arrangements for the conference call. All parties participating in the conference call shall do so via a landline only. The use of cellular phones will not be permitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Deposition of Derek Jahn Chabrowski, filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: A follow-up telephonic conference was held re: settlement conference. Parties agree to appear for a second Settlement Conference before this Court on January 25, 2018 at 1:30 PM. The parties may submit additional information to be considered during the conference on or before Thursday, January 18, 2018. Hearing held 9:00 AM to 9:30 AM. (Not Recorded) (REK)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Telephonically Settlement Conference held on 12/15/2017. Appearing telephonically: Plaintiff, pro se, Derek Jahn Chabrowski; Theodore Floyd Stokes with and for Defendant. A court reporter was not present and the telephonic settlement conference was not recorded. A settlement was not reached. Later: The Parties are directed to confer within the next few business days as to what limited discovery may be ordered to facilitate settlement, and then communicate with this Court regarding the scheduling of a follow-up Settlement Conference. Hearing held 1:30 PM to 4:30 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MHB, ec)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 On the Court's own motion, IT IS ORDERED resetting the Settlement Conference from 12/14/2017 to 12/15/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MHB, ec)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #88 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counterclaim filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 IT IS ORDERED resetting the Settlement Conference from 11/27/2017 to 12/14/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other deadlines in this Court's Order (Doc. 79) remain in effect. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MHB, ec)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 **STRICKEN by Doc. #116 ** MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. *NOTE: Filed as 1 document with #87 Answer. (KAS) Modified on 2/23/2018 (MMO).
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ANSWER to COUNTERCLAIM re: #86 Amended Counterclaim by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. *Note: Filed as 1 document with #88 Motion(KAS)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 *AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM re: #80 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin against Derek Jahn Chabrowski and Anna Chabrowski filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore) *Modified to correct counter defendants on 10/13/2017 (REK).
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 *RESPONSE re: #80 to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore) *Modified to add document link on 10/6/2017 (REK).
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Plaintiff's Amended Request for Admissions and Non-Uniform Interrogatories filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (2 pages) (REK)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ANSWER to #80 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Derek Jahn Chabrowski.(REK)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 * ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Derek Jahn Chabrowski by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin.(Stokes, Theodore) *Modified to list correct counter defendant on 9/14/2017 (REK).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/27/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/01/2017. (REK)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying Defendant Litwin's #66 Motion to Dismiss. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/29/2017. (MMO)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #66 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/1/2018. Dispositive motions due by 3/1/2018. Telephonic Interim Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2018 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/18/2017. (MMO)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/18/2017. Deadlines discussed. Order to issue. LATER: Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns is drawn for purposes of conducting a Settlement Conference. The parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Burns' chambers at 602-322-7610 within 10 days to schedule a Settlement Conference. APPEARANCES: Pro Se Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. Telephonic appearance by Theodore Stokes for Defendants Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 8:58 AM to 9:12 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE/ Objection re: #64 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #66 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: Defendant Mozdyniewicz's motion to dismiss #61 is GRANTED. Defendant Litwin's motion to appear telephonically at the Rule 16 scheduling conference #67 is GRANTED. Plaintiff Chabrowski's motion for leave to file objections #68 is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged documents #69 and #70 as responses to the respective motions. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/16/2017. (REK)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ***Filed at #73 per Order #71 ***LODGED Proposed Plaintiff's Objection to Litwin's Motion to Appear Telephonically re: #68 MOTION for Leave to File Objections to Litwin's Motion to Dismiss #66 and Motion to Appear Telephonically #67 . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK) Modified on 8/16/2017 (REK).
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ***Filed at #72 per Order #71 ***LODGED Proposed Objection to Litwin's Motion to Dismiss re: #68 MOTION for Leave to File Objections to Litwin's Motion to Dismiss #66 and Motion to Appear Telephonically #67 . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK) Modified on 8/16/2017 (REK).
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Objections to Litwin's Motion to Dismiss #66 and Motion to Appear Telephonically #67 by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 *MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at August 18, 2017, 9 am Continued Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stokes, Theodore) *Modified to remove incorrect Ex Parte designation on 8/15/2017 (REK).
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Compliance with Case Managment Order Regarding 12(b) Motions)(Stokes, Theodore)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that the Rule 16 scheduling conference on 6/30/2017 is vacated and reset for 8/18/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L. Rayes. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot #63 #64 motions to appear telephonically. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/27/2017. (MMO)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at June 30, 2017 Scheduling Conference by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stokes, Theodore)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (REK)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Stokes, Theodore)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss Party Roman Mozdyniewicz by Roman Mozdyniewicz. (LAD) (2 pages)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #57 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff shall not file any other motion for sanctions or similar type of motion absent leave of Court. The Clerk shall strike from the record Plaintiff's #58 Objection to Defendants' Non-Acceptance of Service. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/19/2017. (MMO)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying as moot #40 Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process; and granting #56 Motion to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing and Motion to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2017 is reset to 6/30/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/16/2017.(MMO)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 **STRICKEN by Doc. #60 ** OBJECTIONS to #52 Defendants' Non-Acceptance of Service by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (LAD) (3 pages) Modified on 6/19/2017 (MMO).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Sanctions by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (LAD) (6 pages)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing on Issue of Service, MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Scheduled for June 21, 2017 by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stokes, Theodore)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 05/05/2017 to Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin (Acceptance of Service and Waiver of Formal Service of Process). (Stokes, Theodore)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The motion is granted as to Nordahl and the claim against her is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The motion is denied with respect to Litwin's request for dismissal for lack of personal jurisdiction. The Court will rule on the request for dismissal for insufficient service of process after the evidentiary hearing. The request for an award of attorney's fees and costs is DENIED. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/6/2017. (MMO)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #49 Motion to Accept Electronic Record as part of Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/6/2017.(MMO)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE re: of Non-Acceptance of Service by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin, Izabela Nordahl . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Justice Court Reply, #2 Exhibit Bankruptcy Documents)(Stokes, Theodore)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DECLARATION of Terry Nelsen (court registered process server). (SLQ)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Letter/Notice re: Subpoena from Derek Chavrowski from Non-Party Geico Insurance Company. (ATD)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Accept Electronic Record as Part of Judicial Notice (Related to docket #32 ) by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (LAD) (4 pages)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Process, and Insufficient Service of Process) MOTION to Dismiss Case (for Insufficient Process and Insufficent Service of Process) filed by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin, Izabela Nordahl. (Stokes, Theodore)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE to Defendant Roman's #43 Answer to Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (SLQ)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 * SUPPLEMENTAL Response re: #40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (SLQ) Modified to correct document link on 5/15/2017 (SLQ).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 5/5/2017 before Judge Douglas L Rayes: This is the time set for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Discussion is held regarding the pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #40 ). The Court determines that its requirement that the parties confer and plaintiff be allowed to amend before defendants may file a motion to dismiss is not necessary. Plaintiff has seen defendants' motion to dismiss and Plaintiff advises the Court that he will not be filing an amended complaint. Accordingly, the Court will proceed on the Motion to Dismiss, except for the arguments pertaining to service of the summons and complaint. Plaintiff requests time to supplement his response to the motion - GRANTED. Supplemental response is due 5/8/17. Defendants' reply in support is due 5/12/17. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint discovery plan. An Evidentiary Hearing re: Service and a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference are set for 6/21/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Counsel for defendants shall confer with his clients regarding accepting service on their behalf and advise the Court whether the 6/21/17 evidentiary hearing on the issue of service of process may be vacated by no later than 5/12/17. APPEARANCES: Pro Se Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. Telephonic appearance by Theodore Stokes for Defendants Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin and Izabela Nordahl. Defendant Roman Mozdyniewicz not appearing. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 2:35 PM to 3:07 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (KAS)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ANSWER to #28 Amended Complaint by Roman Mozdyniewicz.(SLQ)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE (Proof of Service) re: #37 Plaintiff's Discovery Plan. (SLQ)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE re: Notice of Telephonic Appearance at Hearing Scheduled for May 5, 2017 at 2:30 pm by Out of State Counsel by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin, Izabela Nordahl re: 36 Time Change Only - Hearing . (Stokes, Theodore)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 * MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Process, and Insufficient Service of Process) by Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin, Izabela Nordahl. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Katarzyna Hyclak, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Izabela Nordahl)(Stokes, Theodore). * Added MOTION to Dismiss Case (for Insufficient Process and Insufficent Service of Process) on 5/5/2017 (LAD).
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re: Summons and second amended complaint upon Izabela Nordahl on 3/14/17. (SLQ) Modified on 5/2/2017 (SLQ).
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re: Summons and second amended complaint upon Roman Mozdyniewicz on 3/14/17. (SLQ) Modified on 5/2/2017 (SLQ).
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Plaintiff's Discovery Plan by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (SLQ)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference presently set for 5/5/2017 at 4:30 PM is RESET AS TO TIME ONLY!! Rule 16 Scheduling Conference reset for 5/5/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes. (MMO)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #34 Motion for Court order and sanctions. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/20/2017. (MMO)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Court Order - Manifestation of Defendants Failure to Cooperate in Discovery and Disobeying Rule 26(f) Order by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (SLQ)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Northland Insurance Company. (Grochowski, Walter)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REQUEST (Motion) to Take Judicial Notice of Maricopa County Justice Court Case CC2016-157251RC by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (SLQ)(7 pages).
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court remove Walter Grochowski, Esq.'s name from the service list in this case only. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/28/2017. (MMO)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 * Notice of Waiver of Electronic Service by Northland Insurance Company. (Grochowski, Walter) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 3/10/2017 (LAD).
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2017 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/2/2017. (MMO)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin, Roman Mozdyniewicz, Izabela Nordahl filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (LAD) (23 pages)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Derek Chabrowski's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint (Doc. #23 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the proposed amended complaint (Doc. #24 ). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/1/17. (LAD)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Roman Mozdyniewicz.(KGM)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DECLARATION of Derek Jahn Chabrowski by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (LAD) (26 pages)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 * (Filed at Doc. #28 ) LODGED Proposed Second Amended Complaint for Damages re: #23 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (LAD) (23 pages) Modified on 3/1/2017 (LAD).
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (LAD) (4 pages)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski: Proof of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon Jan Litwin on 1/14/17. (LAD)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski: Proof of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon Izabela Nordahl on 12/12/16. (LAD)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski: Proof of Service re: summons/complaint upon Roman Mozdyniewicz on 12/24/16. (LAD)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and temporary restraining order. FURTHER ORDERED denying #15 Motion for leave to file Amended complaint without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until 2/3/2017 to file a motion for leave to file a new amended complaint consistent with this order. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/19/2017. (MMO)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to #17 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (LAD) (6 pages)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wieslaw Likus.(EJA)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 * (Motion #15 denied by #19 ) LODGED Proposed Amended Complaint re: #15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (KGM) Modified on 1/20/2017 (LAD).
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (KGM)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/14/2016. (MMO)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Terry Nelson, Registered Process Server, re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means by Plaintiff Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (ATD)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (ATD)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Status Conference held on 12/9/2016. Pro se plaintiff is advised that he cannot proceed in this matter representing the LLC. If the LLC is the real-party at interest, plaintiff will need to retain counsel. Counsel for Northland Insurance Company advises the Court that Northland does not wish to be a party to this lawsuit and requests to have their name removed from the docket. Counsel is directed he will need to file a motion accordingly. APPEARANCES: Pro Se Plaintiff Derek Chabrowski. Walter Grochowski for Plaintiff Northland Insurance Company. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 4:43 PM to 4:54 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Counsel for Northland Insurance Company, Walter Grochowski, may appear and participate in the hearing scheduled 12/9/2016 at 4:45 PM if he wishes. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/8/2016. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 * Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel by Northland Insurance Company . (Grochowski, Walter) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 12/8/2016 (LAD).
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff Jahn Chabrowski shall appear in person on 12/9/2016 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes to discuss the pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, (Doc. #6 ), and whether Chabrowski can proceed with the motion and with this case without counsel representing Plaintiffs ARTBE Enterprises, LLC and Northland Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/29/2016. (MMO)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Jahn Chabrowski shall appear in person on December 9, 2016 at 4:45 p.m. in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003, before Judge Douglas L. Rayes to discuss the pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, (Doc. #6 ), and whether Chabrowski can proceed with the motion and with this case without counsel representing Plaintiffs ARTBE Enterprises, LLC and Northland Insurance Company. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/29/16. (JAMA)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (LAD) (26 pages)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying Motion to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing without an Attorney and Supporting Information. Electronic filing requires parties to code their filings so that they are properly docketed electronically. Docketing requires legal training which Plaintiff has not demonstrated that he possesses. When electronically filed documents are not properly docketed they are not easily retrievable by the Court on its case management reports. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/8/2016. (MMO)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (EJA)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/2/2016. (MMO)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX178099. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-3766-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (HLA)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX178099 filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HLA)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Summons Issued at Customer Service Intake Counter as to Marion Blonski, California Department of Motor Vehicles, Wieslaw Likus, Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin, Roman Mozdyniewicz, Izabela Nordahl on 10/31/2016 (HLA)This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chabrowski, et al v. Litwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Blonski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wlodzimierz Jan Litwin
Represented By: Theodore Floyd Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Mozdyniewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Izabela Nordahl
Represented By: Theodore Floyd Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Motor Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wieslaw Likus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chabrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Jahn Chabrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northland Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter Grochowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Anna Chabrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?