Ludwig v. Arizona, State of et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Ludwig
Defendant: Arizona, State of and Donald Conrad
Case Number: 2:2016cv03826
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying 110 Motion for review of taxation of costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/19/2018.(DGC, nvo)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 106 Motion to Amend/Correct. Defendants' request for attorneys' fees is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/3/2018.(DGC, nvo)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 69 Defendants' motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment (Doc. 80 ) is denied. Defendants' motion for attorneys' fees (Doc. 69 ) is denied. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/22/18. (EJA)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/2017.(DGC, nvo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ludwig v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Ludwig
Represented By: Suzanne M Dallimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Conrad
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?