Alonzo v. Akal Security Incorporated
Plaintiff: Ed E Alonzo
Defendant: Akal Security Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2017cv00836
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 68 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment for Defendant and close this case. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/12/19. (DXD)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying 44 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify a Conditional Class. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/21/17.(JAMA) Modified on 11/21/2017 to add WO (JAMA).
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying 40 Defendant's Motion for Temporary Stay of Proceedings. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/7/17.(JAMA)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER striking 26 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and granting 19 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Counts I and III of Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. Counts I and III of Plaintiff's Complaint are dismissed, and Count II remains pending. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/20/17.(LSP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonzo v. Akal Security Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed E Alonzo
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Stanley Lubin
Represented By: Matthew Seth Sarelson
Represented By: Emily Adele Tornabene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akal Security Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?