J & J Sports Productions Incorporated v. Meza-Jimenez et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Incorporated
Defendant: Francisco J Meza-Jimenez, Nydia P Meza and Taqueria Cajeme LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01320
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/4/2018.(DGC, nvo)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT - Plaintiff's motion for default judgment (Doc. 20 ) is granted. Default judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Francisco Meza-Jimenez, individually and d/b/a Taqueria Cajeme, in the amount of $30,000, jointly and severally with the damages awarded previously against Defendants Nydia P. Meza and Taqueira Cajeme, LLC (see Doc. 19 ). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/18. (EJA)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER and DEFAULT JUDGMENT - Plaintiff's motion for default judgment (Doc. 16 ) is granted. Default judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants Nydia P. Meza, individually and d/b/a Taqueria Cajeme, and Taqueria Cajeme, LL C, for violation of 47 U.S.C. § 605, in the amount of $30,000. Plaintiff shall move for default judgment or file a notice of dismissal of the claims against Defendant Francisco Meza Jimenez on or before November 3, 2017. The Clerk shall terminate this action without further order of the Court on November 3, 2017, if Plaintiff fails to do so. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/06/2017. (KAS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions Incorporated v. Meza-Jimenez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco J Meza-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nydia P Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taqueria Cajeme LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?