Carson #091914 v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Lee Carson
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Mike Linderman and Unknown Vicklund
Case Number: 2:2017cv01641
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 432 439 Request for District Court Judges' Review of Magistrate's Order; denying Plaintiff's 438 Motion for Default or Sanctions; denying Plaintiff's 440 Motion for November 19, 2019 Hearing Minutes; denying as moot Plaintiff's 444 Motion for Status. See attachment for details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/16/2020. (CLB)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 163 is ADOPTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: The October 19, 2017, screening order applies to Counts One through Thirteen of the Amended Complaint, and the Amended Complaint does not revive any claims that the Court p reviously dismissed. Counts Seventeen, Eighteen, Nineteen, and Twenty, are DISMISSED. The claims against Defendant Ryan that are alleged in Counts Fourteen, Fifteen, and Sixteen are DISMISSED. Defendant Hernandez shall answer Count Fourteen, Defendan t Erwin shall answer Count Fifteen, and Defendant Ulibarri shall answer Count Sixteen. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Reconsideration 212 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge should direct service on any newly named defendant and issue a scheduling order to govern the disposition of the new claims. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/03/2018. (REK)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER: Plaintiff's "Request for Sanctions on Prison Officials Counsel pursuant to Federal Common Law and First Amendment" 96 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 9/05/2018. (REK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson #091914 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Lee Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Linderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Vicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?