State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Amazon.com Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Amazon.com Incorporated, Amazon.com LLC, Amazon Incorporated, Amazon (USA) Incorporated, Amazon Web Services Incorporated, Amazon Retail LLC, Amazon Retail US LLC, Wallygadgets, Shenzhen Bo Rui Ze Technology Company (China) Limited, LG Shenzhen Technology Company (China) Limited, LG Company (Korea), LG Chem Company (Korea), LG Chem (China) Limited and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2017cv01994
Filed: June 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying 134 Motion for Protective Order. [See attached order for further information.] Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/6/2019. (RMW)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant LG Chem, Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. 82 ), is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re-serve Defendant LG Chem, Ltd. with federal process within 90 days of the date of this Order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/16/18. (MAW)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation for a protective order (Doc. 87 ) is denied, without prejudice [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/10/18. (MAW)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint, (Doc. 74 ) is GRANTED. Because other counts remain, the Clerk of the Court shall not enter judgment at this time (see attached order for details). Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/29/18. (JAT)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant LC Company (Korea) is dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to serve. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all fictitious defendants are dismissed, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by March 23, 2018, Plaintiff shall show cause why Defendant Super Engine should not be dismissed for failure to serve [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/8/18. (MAW)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to the limited extent that Plaintiff has until March 5, 2018 to serve the Defendants located in Korea. Proof of service must be filed no later than March 6, 2018 or these Defendants will be dismissed [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/26/17.(MAW)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants located in China (specifically: (1) Wallygadgets; (2) Shenzhen Bo Rui Ze Technology Company (China) Limited; (2) LG Shenzhen Technology Company (China) Limited; and (4) LG Chem (China) Limited) are dismissed , without prejudice, for failure to serve in accordance with this Court's orders. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, there being no just reason for delay, the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment, dismissing these 4 Defendants (only) without prejudice [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/11/17. (MAW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Amazon.com Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Timothy Lee Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Incorporated
Represented By: James K Kloss
Represented By: Scott McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon (USA) Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Retail LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Retail US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallygadgets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Bo Rui Ze Technology Company (China) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Shenzhen Technology Company (China) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Company (Korea)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem Company (Korea)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem (China) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?