June 26, 2020 |
Filing
536
ORDER re: 534 : IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 524) is DENIED. See the attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 6/26/2020. (RMW)
|
June 24, 2020 |
Filing
526
ORDER re: Minute Order Doc. 525: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Continue the Trial to November 30, 2020 (Doc. 497 ) is DENIED. The 6/29/2020 trial date is confirmed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply (Doc. 510 ) is DENIED as moot. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 6/24/2020. (RMW)
|
June 2, 2020 |
Filing
496
ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Proposed Final Pretrial Order (Doc. 487 ) is DENIED. (See the attached order for additional information.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 6/2/2020. (RMW)
|
May 18, 2020 |
Filing
485
ORDER that the Motion to Strike (Doc. 468 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as described herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall strike the Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order (Doc. [457-1]) from the docket. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that the parties shall file a notice by Tuesday, 5/26/2020, that designates one attorney who will serve as lead counsel for the duration of this case and that indicates whether they have agreed to one characterization of each contested issue. If the parties indicate in this notice that they were unable to do so, designated lead counsel shall appear, in person, before this Court on Wednesday, 6/3/2020, to mediate any dispute as to the characterization of any contested issues. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall correct the errors identified above in the Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order (Doc. [457-1]) and then finalize and sign the revised joint proposed final pretrial order and lodge it with the Court by Friday, 6/5/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall strike the Proposed Jury Instructions (Doc. 460 ; Doc. [460-1]; Doc. [460-2]). See attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 5/18/2020. (RMW)
|
April 17, 2020 |
Filing
478
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties may file a memorandum, not to exceed ten pages, that discusses whether individuals or information that will be offered to supply evidence "solely for impeachment," as that term is used in Federal Rule o f Civil Procedure 26(a)(1)(A)(i)(ii), must be disclosed pursuant to General Order No. 17-08. The parties must file this memorandum by Friday, 5/1/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party may file a response to the memorandum filed by the opposing party. The response may not exceed five pages and will be due by Friday, 5/8/2020. See attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 4/17/2020. (RMW)
|
April 13, 2020 |
Filing
474
ORDER that the Objection to Omron's Witness List (Doc. 464 ) is OVERRULED. See attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 4/13/2020. (RMW)
|
March 6, 2020 |
Filing
462
ORDER that the following motions in limine, filed by Plaintiff, are DENIED: Docs. 400 , 401 , 402 , 403 , 406 , 407 , 410 , 411 , 412 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following motions in limine, filed by Defendant, are DENIED: Docs. 413 , 416 , 419 , 421 , 422 , 423 , 424 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Doc. 420 is GRANTED such that Richard Williams is excluded from testifying at trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following motions to seal are DENIED as moot as review of the d ocuments lodged under seal was unnecessary to the Court's resolution of the motions in limine: Docs. 404 , 408 , 414 , 417 , 425 , 429 , 443 , 446 , 449 , 452 . The Clerk of Court shall not unseal the related documents and shall instead leave Docs. 405 , 409 , 415 , 418 , 426 , 430 , 444 , 447 , 450 , 453 lodged under seal. See attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/6/2020. (RMW)
|
January 21, 2020 |
Filing
398
ORDER That the Clerk of Court shall strike the Offer of Proof (Doc. 360 ) and First Supplemental Offer of Proof (Doc. 387 ) from the record. This Order is without prejudice to future offers of proof that are particularized to meet a specific evidentiary ruling with a particularized, succinct, and specific description of the evidence that has been excluded. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions to seal (Docs. 361 , 388 ) are DENIED because review of the unredacted materials fi led along with the Offers of Proof (Docs. 360 , 387 ) were unnecessary to the Court's determination that the Offers of Proof (Docs. 360 , 387 ) must be stricken. The Clerk of Court shall strike Docs. 362 to 380 and 389 from the reco rd but leave them under seal. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's request for attorneys' fees (Doc. 395 ) is DENIED with prejudice and Plaintiff's request for leave to file a response to the request (Doc. 396 ) is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court shall strike Plaintiff's lodged proposed response to the request for attorneys' fees (Doc. 397 ). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/17/20. (MAP)
|
November 15, 2019 |
Filing
358
AMENDED ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Preclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Walter Bratic (Doc. 293 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Preclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Uzi Sasson (Doc. 299 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following motions to seal relating to Defendant's Daubert Motions (Docs. 320 ; 322 ; 330 ; 347 ; 348 ) are DENIED for the reason indicated above. The Clerk of Court shall not unseal the related documents and shall instead leave Docs. 295 ; 301 ; 331 ; 339 ; 342 lodged under seal. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/15/2019. (SST)
|
November 13, 2019 |
Filing
355
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 153 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 229 ) is GRANTED IN PART and D ENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Preclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Business Valuation Expert Greg Mischou (Doc. 296 ) is GRANTED as his expert testimony is irrelevant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the followi ng motions to seal (Docs. 194 ; 228 ; 304 ; 309 ; 321 ; 323 ; 345 ; 346 ) are DENIED for the reason indicated above. The Clerk of Court shall not unseal the related documents and shall instead leave Docs. 195 ; 230 ; 298 ; 305 ; 307 ; 310 ; 325 ; 329 ; 336 lodged under seal. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/13/2019. (SST)
|
October 17, 2019 |
Filing
349
ORDER denying IceMOS's Motion to Modify the Protective Order for Confidential Information (Doc. 314 ) without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the Motion to Seal the Motion to Modify the Protective Order (Doc. 313 ). The Clerk of the C ourt shall leave Doc. 254 under seal but strike it. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the Motion to Seal the Response to the Motion to Modify the Protective Order (Doc. 285 ). The Clerk of the Court shall leave Doc. 286 lodged, under seal. See attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 10/17/2019. (RMW)
|
September 30, 2019 |
Filing
343
*ORDER denying 227 Daubert Motion to Exclude Allan Morrison as an Expert FURTHER ORDERED denying 238 Daubert Motion to Exclude Charles Malek as an Expert FURTHER ORDERED denying 241 Daubert Motion to Exclude Randy Cavaiani as an Expert FURT HER ORDERED DENYING 244 Daubert Motion to Exclude Robert Vincent as an Expert FURTHER ORDERED denying 247 Daubert Motion to Exclude Kenneth Malek as an Expert. FURTHER ORDERED denying Motions to Seal Relating to Plaintiff's Daubert Motio ns: 237 ; 240 ; 243 ; 246 ; 258 ; 262 ; 265 ; 276 ; 280 ; 289 ; 291 ; 292 . The Clerk of Court shall not unseal the related documents and shall instead leave Docs. 239 ; 242 ; 245 ; 248 ; 257 ; 259 ; 263 ; 266 ; 269 ; 272 ; [2 77]; 281 lodged under seal. FURTHER ORDERED denying [244-1] (Doc. 249 ). The sealed, lodged exhibit (Doc. [244-1]) shall be stricken but remain under seal. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/30/19. (MAP) *Modified to correct text on 9/30/2019 (MAP).
|
May 22, 2019 |
Filing
196
ORDER that the motion for clarification (Doc. 186 ) is granted to the extent clarification was provided herein but denied in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff shall not seek further reconsideration, clarification, or other exceptio ns to this Court's fact discovery deadline. If Plaintiff continues to seek reconsideration unjustifiably in this case, Defendant may move for sanctions if Defendant deems such request to be appropriate. See 28 U.S.C. § 1927. [See attached order for additional information.] Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 5/22/2019. (RMW)
|
May 16, 2019 |
Filing
185
ORDER setting an in-person Discovery Dispute Hearing for Wednesday, 5/22/2019, at 11:00 AM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 3:00 PM, Monday, 5/20/2019, each party shall file a brief, not to exceed seven pages addressing Omron's objec tions to 7 categories of documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall attach to its brief the 97 Rule 45 subpoenas (or categories therein) at issue and a copy of Defendant's objection thereto. [See attached order for additional information.] Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 5/16/2019. (RMW)
|
April 4, 2019 |
Filing
152
ORDER denying 69 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Clerk of Court shall not enter judgment at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court finds that Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant IceMOS's pending M otion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 145 ) and Motion for Rule 11 Sanction (Doc. 151 ) are both premature, given that they were filed before the Court ruled on the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Doc. 69 ). Therefore, the motions are both denied, without prejudice to re-filing, if appropriate in view of this Order. [See attached order for additional information.] Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 4/4/2019. (RMW)
|
December 27, 2018 |
Filing
91
ORDER denying 72 Defendant Omron Corporation's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The parties shall respond and reply to the pending Rule 12(c) Motion (Doc. 69 ) in accordance with the timeline set forth in the Court's previous Order (Doc. 85 ) on the subject. (See attached order for additional information.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 12/27/2018. (RMW)
|
October 2, 2018 |
Filing
49
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation for a confidentiality order (Doc. 45 ) is denied, without prejudice [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/2/18. (MAW)
|
August 29, 2017 |
Filing
18
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by the time set by the Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant files a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, the time to file an answer and any counterclaim (s) pursuant to General Order 17-08 § A.5 is hereby DEFERRED until 10 days after the Court issues its order deciding Defendant's to-be-filed motion to dismiss the above-captioned case for lack of personal jurisdiction; hereby granting Doc. 12 to the extent specified in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's time to serve responses to the mandatory initial discovery under General Order 17-08 § A.6 shall be measured from the date of Defendant's answer/counterclaim(s) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/29/17. (MAW)
|