Cramton v. Grabbagreen Franchising LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kim Cramton
Defendant: Grabbagreen Franchising LLC, Eat Clean Operations LLC, Eat Clean Holdings LLC, Kelli Newman and Keely Newman
Case Number: 2:2017cv04663
Filed: December 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Bridget S Bade
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: (1) Witnesses Price, Gitt, Mills, Ferrell, Glines, Mavros, and Modders may testify remotely at trial via video teleconference under Rule 43(a). (2) Defendants must, by November 20, 2020, file a response (which may not exceed seven pages) addressing whether Griffin should be precluded from testifying as a sanction under Rule 37 based on late disclosure. (3) Plaintiff may, by November 30, 2020, file a reply (which may not exceed five pages) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/13/20. (MAW)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER: Pending before the Court is a somewhat unusual ethical and evidentiary questionwhether attorney Kelli Newman ("Counsel"), who was once named as a defendant in this action, may represent the remaining defendants (one of whom is her spouse) during the upcoming bench trial even though she is also expected to testify as a witness during the bench trial and even though the parties have invoked Federal Rule of Evidence 615, the so-called rule of exclusion. For the following reasons, the Court concludes that Counsel may serve as trial counsel [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/12/20. (MAW)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motion for judicial notice (Doc. 308 ) is granted in part and denied in part [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/15/20. (MAW)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: (1) The current trial date of October 13, 2020 is vacated. (2) Cramton's motion to strike (Doc. 333 ) is denied. (3) Cramton may file a reply in support of her damages-related motion (Doc. 320 ) by September 10, 2020. The reply shall not exceed 11 pages [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/3/20. (MAW)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to seal (Doc. 257 ) is denied. The lodged, unredacted versions of MIL 3 and MIL 4 will remain lodged under seal and will not be filed. The redacted versions of MIL 3 and MIL 4 are struck. Plaintiff may file unredacted versions of MIL 3 and MIL 4 (or may make another attempt at justifying sealing) by March 4, 2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/26/20. (MAW)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motion for reconsideration (Doc. 249 ) is denied [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/7/20. (MAW)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: (1) Defendants' motion to supplement the record (Doc. 200 ) is granted; (2) Defendants' motion for sanctions (Doc. 206 ) is denied; (3) Cramton's motion for leave to file a sur-reply (Doc. 229 ) is d enied as moot; (4) Kelli's motion to strike changes to Cramton's deposition testimony (Doc. 220 ) is denied; (5) Cramton's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 142 ) is granted in part and denied in part; (6) Defendants' m otion for summary judgment (Doc. 143 ) is granted in part and denied in part; (7) Based on the aforementioned rulings, the following claims and counterclaims, or portions thereof, are no longer pending: all claims against Kelli pursued under a community property theory; Counts One, Two, and Three; Count Four (as to ECO, ECH, and Kelli); Count Five (as to liability); Counts Six and Eight; and Counterclaims One, Two, Three, Four, and Five; and (8) Based on the aforementioned rulings, the following claims (or portions thereof) remain pending: Count Four (as to Keely and GFL); Count Five (as to damages); and Counts Seven, Nine, and Ten [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/23/19. (MAW)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: (1) The amended motion to seal (Doc. 224 ) is denied; and (2) Pursuant to LRCiv 5.6(e), the lodged document (Doc. 222-1) will not be filed. The submitting party may, within five days of the entry of this Order, resubmit the document for filing in the public record [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/16/19. (MAW)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the 187 "Notice" is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to update the docket to indicate that Defendant/Counterclaimant Kelli Newman is pro se (for both her defense and counterclaim) pursuant to the Court&# 039;s May 16, 2019 178 Order, Defendants/Counterclaimants Grabbagreen Franchising, LLC, Eat Clean Operations, LLC, Eat Clean Holdings, LLC, and Keely Newman are represented (in their defenses and counterclaims) by T&B attorneys Jack Robert V rablik and Robert A. Royal, and Counterclaimant Gulf Girl Squared Incorporated likewise is represented by T&B attorneys Jack Robert Vrablik and Robert A. Royal. The docket should reflect that Erin Hertzog was terminated per her April 26, 2019 [1 74] "Notice of Disassociation of Counsel". The docket should further reflect that Cronus attorneys Larry Cohen, Jeff Bouma, and Joel Fugate have never represented any party in this action. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/17/19. (MSA)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that: (1) Defendants' motion for reconsideration (Doc. 136 ) is granted; (2) Defendants are authorized to depose Cramton for an additional three hours, by May 31, 2019; and (3) The additional deposition need not be limited to the topics of the minimum wage claim and the Cramton-Farrell calls and may also encompass the topics of the Cramton-Mavros call and the iPhone/iCloud issues [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/30/19. (MAW)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion to Seal Exhibit 68 to Defendant's Refiled Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 144 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall seal Exhibit 68. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants� 39; unopposed Motion to Seal Exhibits 6A and 7A to Defendants' Refiled Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 145 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall seal Exhibits 6A and 7A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff/Counter-Defendants' Motion to Seal or Strike Page 70 of Docket # 128 -1 and Page 47 of Docket # 128 -2 (Doc. 148 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall strike Docs. 128 -1 and 128 -2 from the record. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/7/19. (SLQ)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED denying without prejudice the Joint Motion to Seal Exhibits to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 127 ) and the Joint Motion to Seal Exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary J udgment (Doc. 130 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to LRCiv 5.6(e), the lodged documents will not be filed, but will remain under seal. The Court will extend the time provided by LRCiv 5.6(e) for the parties to act. The parties may, within 15 days of the entry of this Order, (1) confer and agree to remove the confidential designation from the exhibits previously designated confidential, and refile the motions for summary judgment, containing all exhibits in unsealed form, in the pub lic record, (2) file new drafts of the motions for summary judgment in the public record, including and relying on only those exhibits that are not designated confidential, or (3) file new joint motions to seal that conform with the requirements delineated herein. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/14/19. (SLQ)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the joint motion to amend the scheduling order (Doc. 79 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/6/18. (MAW).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cramton v. Grabbagreen Franchising LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Cramton
Represented By: Todd Feltus
Represented By: Michelle Ray Matheson
Represented By: Cara Molly Louise Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grabbagreen Franchising LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eat Clean Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eat Clean Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keely Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?