Schofield v. Compass Bank et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Schofield
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated and Compass Bank
Case Number: 2:2018cv02545
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting #16 Stipulation For Extension of Time: Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC shall have until 10/11/2018 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/2/2018. (LMR)
September 27, 2018 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint Second Request by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jurayeva, Adiba)
September 24, 2018 15 NOTICE re: Service of Court's Preliminary Order by Lisa Schofield re: #6 Order, Set Deadlines . (Chami, David)
September 17, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting #10 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 9/27/2018. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/17/18. (LAD)
September 14, 2018 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Compass Bank.(Zimmerman, Joshua)
September 13, 2018 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Wagner, Emily)
September 13, 2018 11 Experian Information Solution, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated.(Wagner, Emily)
September 11, 2018 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jurayeva, Adiba)
September 6, 2018 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lisa Schofield: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge, Preliminary Order, & Notice to Parties of Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Compass Bank on 8/24/18. (Chami, David)
August 30, 2018 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lisa Schofield: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge, Preliminary Order, & Notice to Parties of Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 8/23/18. (Chami, David)
August 27, 2018 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lisa Schofield: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge, Preliminary Order, & Notice to Parties of Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Equifax Information Services, LLC on 8/23/18. (Chami, David)
August 15, 2018 6 Featured Case PRELIMINARY ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than November 8, 2018; 2. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 3. That unless the Court orders otherwise, on November 8, 2018, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 4. That, in accordance with the MIDP General Order, Defendant(s) must file a responsive pleading (an answer, counterclaim, crossclaim, and/or reply) within the time set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, irrespective of whether Defendant(s) intend to file a preliminary motion; 5. That, in accordance with the MIDP General Order, the parties must exchange MIDP Responses and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court no later than thirty (30) days after the first responsive pleading (an answer, counterclaim, crossclaim, and/or reply) is filed; 6. That, in accordance with the MIDP General Order, supplemental MIDP Responses shall be served on the opposing party no later than thirty (30) days after the information is discovered or revealed; 7. That, in accordance with the MIDP General Order, the parties must produce to the opposing party the electronically stored information identified in the MIDP Responses no later than forty (40) days after the MIDP Responses have been served; and 8. That unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/13/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Parties)(SLQ)
August 10, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
August 10, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Compass Bank, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 10, 2018 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15830574. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02545-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
August 10, 2018 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Lisa Schofield. (Chami, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
August 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15830574 filed by Lisa Schofield. (Chami, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schofield v. Compass Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Adiba Jurayeva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Emily Gildar Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Bank
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Joshua Robert Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Schofield
Represented By: David Ali Chami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?