Ecole Insurance Company v. McGhee et al

Plaintiff: Ecole Insurance Company
Defendant: Unknown Parties and David McGhee
Case Number: 2:2018cv02548
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2018 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Answer to Complaint filed by David McGhee. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Forms of Papers. The name, address, email address, State Bar Attorney number, telephone number, and optionally the fax number, of the attorney appearing for the party in the action - must be typewritten or printed in the space to the left of the center of the page and beginning at line one on the first page. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
September 18, 2018 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by David McGhee.(Fitch, Douglas)
September 13, 2018 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ecole Insurance Company: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon David McGhee on 08/28/2018. (Beck, Teresa)
August 28, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to David McGhee. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 27, 2018 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Ecole Insurance Company. (Beck, Teresa)
August 10, 2018 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
August 10, 2018 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15831443. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-02548-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
August 10, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ecole Insurance Company. (Beck, Teresa) (BAR)
August 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15831443 filed by Ecole Insurance Company. (Beck, Teresa) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ecole Insurance Company v. McGhee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McGhee
Represented By: Douglas H Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ecole Insurance Company
Represented By: Teresa Marie Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?