Simon v. Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Leo Simon
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv02573
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, U.S. Bank National Association at counter (JJH) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, without prepayment of fees or costs, or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver of the summons and complaint. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 10/3/18. (LAD)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE (CERTIFICATE) of Service as to Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, Registered Agent and US Bank National Association by Leo Simon of #1 Complaint by certified mail. (LAD) (1 page; PS Form 3811, Domestic Return Receipt, not provided)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SST)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SST)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02573-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form Instructions)(SST)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (long form) by Leo Simon. (SST)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Leo Simon.(SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?