JFQ Lending Incorporated v. Unknown Party et al

Plaintiff: JFQ Lending Incorporated
Defendant: Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2018cv02752
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: Arizona District Court
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER: IT IS ORDERED pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after November 28, 2018, unless before then Plaintiff has served defendant with the summons and complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/25/18. (MAW)
September 18, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Consideration and Decision of Ex Parte Motion to Subpoena Identifying Information and Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Subpoena Identifying Information of Plaintiff JFQ Lending, Inc. Plaintiff may subpoena customer records from Inteliquent, Inc. and Bandwidth.com CLEC, LLC, or any other phone service providers necessary to obtain identifying information regarding the John Doe Defendants (Docs. #9 and #10 ). Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/18/18. (MAW)
September 14, 2018 17 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by JFQ Lending Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice Re Trademark)(Atkinson, Blake)
September 12, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER: On August 31, 2018, a minute order issued (Doc. #6 ) advising counsel that this matter has been designated as a copyright, trademark or patent case. Counsel was directed to either complete and file the attached form, which would be provided to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office, or file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary within 7 days of the date of the minute order. As of this date, counsel has neither submitted the completed form or filed the appropriate notice. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs counsel either file the completed form or submit the notice not later than 14 days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Court Order may result in sanctions being imposed. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/12/18. (MAW)
September 4, 2018 15 Summons Reissued as to Unknown Party(named as John Doe V: owner of (478) 253-5652), Unknown Party(named as John Doe III: owner of (503) 447-3022), Unknown Party(named as John Doe II: owner of (614) 363-6384), Unknown Party(named as John Doe I: owner of (276) 221-3367), Unknown Party(named as John Doe IV: owner of (352) 227-6646). (JJH)
September 4, 2018 14 Summons Issued as to Unknown Party(named as John Doe I: owner of (276) 221-3367). (JJH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 31, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/31/18. (MAW)
August 31, 2018 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 MOTION for Discovery MOTION Issue Subpoena re: #1 Complaint Ex Parte Motion to Subpoena Identifying Information and Proposed Form of Order filed by JFQ Lending Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
August 31, 2018 11 SUMMONS Submitted by JFQ Lending Incorporated. (Austin, Anthony)
August 31, 2018 10 *MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION AND DECISION OF EX PARTE MOTION TO SUBPOENA IDENTIFYING INFORMATION #9 by JFQ Lending Incorporated. (Austin, Anthony) *Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 9/4/2018 (SLQ).
August 31, 2018 9 EX PARTE MOTION for Discovery , MOTION Issue Subpoena re: #1 Complaint Ex Parte Motion to Subpoena Identifying Information and Proposed Form of Order by JFQ Lending Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-G)(Austin, Anthony)
August 31, 2018 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Summons Submitted filed by JFQ Lending Incorporated. One defendant should be listed per summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
August 31, 2018 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
August 31, 2018 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO121)(MCO)
August 31, 2018 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by JFQ Lending Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
August 30, 2018 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15907108. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02752-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
August 30, 2018 3 SUMMONS Submitted by JFQ Lending Incorporated. (Austin, Anthony) (MCO)
August 30, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JFQ Lending Incorporated. (Austin, Anthony) (MCO)
August 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15907108 filed by JFQ Lending Incorporated. (Austin, Anthony) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JFQ Lending Incorporated v. Unknown Party et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JFQ Lending Incorporated
Represented By: Blake Walton Atkinson
Represented By: Anthony Warren Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?