Puente et al v. Phoenix, City of et al
Plaintiff: Ira Yedlin, Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis and Cynthia Guillen
Defendant: Glenn Neville, Lane White, Unknown Parties, Phoenix, City of, Christopher Turiano, Jeri L Williams, Robert Scott, Douglas McBride, John Sticca, Jeffrey Howell, George Herr and Benjamin Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02778
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at November 13, 2018 Pretrial Conference. Chambers will e-mail dial-in instructions to all out-of-state counsel. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/1/18. (JAMA)
October 29, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at November 13, 2018 Pretrial Conference by Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order re Mtn for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Pretrial Conference)(Piovia-Scott, Joshua)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting #39 the Motion to Appear Telephonically at November 13, 2018 Pretrial Scheduling Conference. Speaker phones and cell phones are not permitted. (See attached Order for additional details for telephonic appearance). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/25/18. (JAMA)
October 23, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic by George Herr, Jeffrey Howell, Douglas McBride, Benjamin Moore, Glenn Neville, Phoenix, City of, Robert Scott, John Sticca, Christopher Turiano, Lane White, Jeri L Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Popham, Gary)
October 9, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Mildred K O'Linn on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 8, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by George Herr, Jeffrey Howell, Douglas McBride, Benjamin Moore, Glenn Neville, Phoenix, City of, Robert Scott, John Sticca, Christopher Turiano, Unknown Parties, Lane White, Jeri L Williams.(Popham, Gary)
September 28, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL AMENDED TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings held on 09/20/2018, before Judge John J. Tuchi. (Court Reporter: Elaine Cropper). Amended to correct cover page. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2018. (RAP)
September 28, 2018 Filing 35 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Herr, Douglas McBride, Glenn Neville, Christopher Turiano, Lane White: Acceptance of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Christopher Turiano, Douglas McBride, George Herr, Glenn Neville and Lane White on September 18, 2018. (Tuskai, Leslie)
September 26, 2018 Filing 36 *(AMENDED TRANSCRIPT FILED AT DOC. #37 ) - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings held on 09/20/2018, before Judge John J. Tuchi. (Court Reporter: Elaine Cropper). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2018. (RAP) *Modified to reference amended version on 10/3/2018 (RAP).
September 26, 2018 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin for proceedings held on September 20, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference, Judge John J Tuchi hearing judge(s). (Brody, Kathleen)
September 25, 2018 Disc - As outlined in the Plaintiffs' Notice of Lodging Non-Electronic Exhibits (Doc. #33 ) has been received and will be stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
September 25, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Lodging Non-Electronic Exhibits by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin re: #19 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . (Brody, Kathleen)
September 24, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin re: #8 Order . (Brody, Kathleen)
September 24, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin re: #8 Order . (Brody, Kathleen)
September 24, 2018 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by George Herr, Jeffrey Howell, Douglas McBride, Benjamin Moore, Glenn Neville, Phoenix, City of, Robert Scott, John Sticca, Christopher Turiano, Unknown Parties, Lane White, Jeri L Williams for proceedings held on 09/20/2018, Judge John J Tuchi hearing judge(s). (OGrady, Mary)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/21/18. (JAMA)
September 21, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #25 Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint) filed by Christopher Turiano, Lane White, Benjamin Moore, John Sticca, Douglas McBride, Jeffrey Howell, Glenn Neville, George Herr, Phoenix, City of, Robert Scott, #21 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Christopher Turiano, Lane White, Douglas McBride, John Sticca, Benjamin Moore, Jeri L Williams, Jeffrey Howell, Glenn Neville, Unknown Parties, George Herr, Robert Scott, Phoenix, City of. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
September 20, 2018 Filing 28 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Amending Doc. 26 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Amending Doc. 24 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/20/2018. Discussion held. IT IS ORDERED setting a Scheduling Conference for 11/13/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting #22 Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw their Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED withdrawing #20 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file their responsive pleading(s) by no later than 10/8/2018. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 2:28 PM to 2:54 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA) Reason for Amendment: To Add Attorney Appearances. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Kathleen Brody, Darrell Hill and Joshua Piovia-Scott for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Bradley Holm, Mary OGrady, David Rosenbaum, Leslie Tuskai and Gary Popham for Defendants. Reason for Amendment: To Correct Time of Scheduling Conference on 11/13/2018 from 10:00 AM to 9:00 AM.
September 20, 2018 Filing 26 *(AMENDED by Doc. 28 )*AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Amending Doc. 24 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/20/2018. Discussion held. IT IS ORDERED setting a Scheduling Conference for 11/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting #22 Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw their Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED withdrawing #20 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file their responsive pleading(s) by no later than 10/8/2018. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 2:28 PM to 2:54 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA) Reason for Amendment: To Add Attorney Appearances. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Kathleen Brody, Darrell Hill and Joshua Piovia-Scott for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Bradley Holm, Mary OGrady, David Rosenbaum, Leslie Tuskai and Gary Popham for Defendants. Modified on 9/21/2018 (JAMA).
September 20, 2018 Filing 25 AMENDED DOCUMENT by George Herr, Jeffrey Howell, Douglas McBride, Benjamin Moore, Glenn Neville, Phoenix, City of, Robert Scott, John Sticca, Christopher Turiano, Lane White. Amendment to #21 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel . (Wilde, Nishan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 24 *(AMENDED by Doc. 26 )*MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/20/2018. Discussion held. IT IS ORDERED setting a Scheduling Conference for 11/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting #22 Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw their Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED withdrawing #20 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file their responsive pleading(s) by no later than 10/8/2018. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 2:28 PM to 2:54 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA) Modified on 9/21/2018 (JAMA).
September 20, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE re: Notice Relating to 9/20/2018, 2:30 P.M. Telephonic Status Conference by George Herr, Jeffrey Howell, Douglas McBride, Benjamin Moore, Glenn Neville, Phoenix, City of, Robert Scott, John Sticca, Christopher Turiano, Unknown Parties, Lane White, Jeri L Williams . (OGrady, Mary)
September 20, 2018 Filing 22 *WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brody, Kathleen) *Modified on 9/21/2018 to correct event (GMP).
September 20, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Lee Popham, Jr on behalf of George Herr, Jeffrey Howell, Douglas McBride, Benjamin Moore, Glenn Neville, Phoenix, City of, Robert Scott, John Sticca, Christopher Turiano, Unknown Parties, Lane White, Jeri L Williams. (Popham, Gary)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 *WITHDRAWN per Doc. 24 )*MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cindy Panuco, #2 Index and Exs. 1-44 to Panuco Declaration, #3 Declaration of Kathleen E. Brody, #4 Index and Exs. 1-3 to Brody Declaration, #5 Declaration of Carlos Garcia, #6 Declaration of Jacinta Gonzales Goodman and Exhibit 1, #7 Declaration of Cynthia Guillen, #8 Declaration of Virdiana Hernandez, #9 Declaration of Mitzi Mendoza, #10 Declaration of Jane Travis, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(SLQ) Modified on 9/20/2018 (JAMA).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Their Motion for Temporary Restraining Order in Excess of Page Limits Pursuant to LRCiv 7.2(e) (Doc. #12 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to file on the docket the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order lodged at Doc. #13 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Non-Electronic Exhibits in Support of Their Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #14 ). (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/20/18. (SLQ)
September 20, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE re: Relating to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Phoenix, City of re: #12 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Their Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . (OGrady, Mary)
September 19, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic status hearing to set a briefing and hearing schedule regarding the TRO is set for September 20, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. Chambers will e-mail call-in instructions to counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
September 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Steve Tuskai on behalf of George Herr, Jeffrey Howell, Douglas McBride, Benjamin Moore, Glenn Neville, Phoenix, City of, Robert Scott, John Sticca, Christopher Turiano, Lane White, Jeri L Williams. (Tuskai, Leslie)
September 19, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ruth OGrady on behalf of George Herr, Jeffrey Howell, Douglas McBride, Benjamin Moore, Glenn Neville, Phoenix, City of, Robert Scott, John Sticca, Christopher Turiano, Lane White, Jeri L Williams. (OGrady, Mary)
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION re: #13 Lodged Proposed Document Plaintiffs' Motion for Filing Non-Electronic Exhibits by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brody, Kathleen)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 *Filed at #20 * LODGED Proposed Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cindy Panuco, #2 Index and Exs. 1-44 to Panuco Declaration, #3 Declaration of Kathleen E. Brody, #4 Index and Exs. 1-3 to Brody Declaration, #5 Declaratoin of Carlos Garcia, #6 Declaration of Jacinta Gonzales Goodman and Exhibit 1, #7 Declaration of Cynthia Guillen, #8 Declaration of Virdiana Hernandez, #9 Declaration of Mitzi Mendoza, #10 Declaration of Jane Travis, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Brody, Kathleen) Modified on 9/20/2018 (SLQ).
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Their Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brody, Kathleen)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Poder in Action), Corporate Disclosure Statement (Puente), Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge, Notice to Parties of Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Jeri L. Williams, Chief, Phoenix Police Department on September 6, 2018. (Brody, Kathleen)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Poder in Action), Corporate Disclosure Statement (Puente), Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge, Notice to Parties of Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon City of Phoenix on September 4, 2018. (Brody, Kathleen)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 4, 2018. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/5/18. (JAMA)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/5/18. (JAMA)
September 4, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Dan Stormer, Joshua Piovia-Scott and Cindy Panuco on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(SIB). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15913880. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-2778-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Cynthia Guillen, Poder in Action, Puente, Janet Travis, Ira Yedlin. (Brody, Kathleen) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(SIB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Puente. (Brody, Kathleen) (SIB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Poder in Action. (Brody, Kathleen) (SIB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15913880 filed by Poder in Action, Puente, Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman, Ira Yedlin, Janet Travis, Cynthia Guillen. (Brody, Kathleen) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Exhibit 8-14, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SIB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puente et al v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Yedlin
Represented By: Kathleen E Brody
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Dan Stormer
Represented By: Darrell Lavar Hill
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinta Gonzalez Goodman
Represented By: Kathleen E Brody
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Dan Stormer
Represented By: Darrell Lavar Hill
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poder in Action
Represented By: Kathleen E Brody
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Dan Stormer
Represented By: Darrell Lavar Hill
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puente
Represented By: Kathleen E Brody
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Dan Stormer
Represented By: Darrell Lavar Hill
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Travis
Represented By: Kathleen E Brody
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Dan Stormer
Represented By: Darrell Lavar Hill
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Guillen
Represented By: Kathleen E Brody
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Dan Stormer
Represented By: Darrell Lavar Hill
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Neville
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane White
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Turiano
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri L Williams
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Scott
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas McBride
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sticca
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Howell
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Herr
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Moore
Represented By: Gary Lee Popham, Jr.
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nishan Joseph Wilde
Represented By: Leslie Steve Tuskai
Represented By: Joshua Michael Whitaker
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Represented By: Mildred K OLinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?