State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Beverage Air Corporation et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Beverage Air Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv02800
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, #12 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Beverage Air Corporation. (Johnson, Jeremy)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Moulton, Timothy)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Moulton, Timothy)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Beverage Air Corporation. (Johnson, Jeremy)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Beverage Air Corporation.(Johnson, Jeremy)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Moulton, Timothy)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/6/2018. (MMO)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/6/2018. (MMO)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beverage Air Corporation. (Johnson, Jeremy) *Modified to remove corporate party on 9/7/2018 (EJA).
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Beverage Air Corporation. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Beverage Air Corporation and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (SIB)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15922934. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-02800-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB)
September 5, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial, Certificate re Compulsory Arbitration upon Beverage Air Corporation on 8/6/2018. (SIB) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-005227. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15922934 filed by Beverage Air Corporation. (Johnson, Jeremy) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(SIB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Beverage Air Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Timothy Lee Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverage Air Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?