Holly et al v. JMT Mechanical,LLC
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers' Local 359, Arizona Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Arizona Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Trades Industry Program, Arizona Sheet Metal Trade Pension Trust Fund, James Dinan and Jeffrey Holly
Defendant: JMT Mechanical,LLC and JMT Mechanical LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02807
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Arizona Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Arizona Sheet Metal Trade Pension Trust Fund, Arizona Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Trades Industry Program, James Dinan, Jeffrey Holly, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers' Local 359. (Barrett, Gerald)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 1/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendant and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/23/2018. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/23/2018. (LFIG)
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J. Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-2807-PHX-DJH. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for October 29, 2018 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order that Arizona Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Arizona Sheet Metal Trade Pension Trust Fund, Arizona Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Trades Industry Program, James Dinan, Jeffrey Holly, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers' Local 359 show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/29/2018 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeffrey Holly: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint upon JMT Mechanical, LLC on 9/17/2018. (Barrett, Gerald)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to JMT Mechanical,LLC. (SIB). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15929596. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-2807-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (SIB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Arizona Sheet Metal Trade Pension Trust Fund, Arizona Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Trades Industry Program, James Dinan, Jeffrey Holly, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers' Local 359. (Barrett, Gerald) (SIB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers' Local 359. (Barrett, Gerald) (SIB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Trades Industry Program. (Barrett, Gerald) (SIB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund. (Barrett, Gerald) (SIB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Sheet Metal Trade Pension Trust Fund. (Barrett, Gerald) (SIB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James Dinan, Jeffrey Holly trustees for Arizona Sheet Metal Trades Health & Welfare Trust Fund. (Barrett, Gerald) (SIB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15929596 filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers' Local 359, Jeffrey Holly, Arizona Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Arizona Sheet Metal Trade Pension Trust Fund, James Dinan, Arizona Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Trades Industry Program. (Barrett, Gerald) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SIB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holly et al v. JMT Mechanical,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers' Local 359
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Trades Industry Program
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Sheet Metal Trade Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dinan
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Holly
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMT Mechanical,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMT Mechanical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?