Philpot v. Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC
Plaintiff: Larry G Philpot
Defendant: Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv03084
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Referring Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC answer due 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 11/19/2018. (BAR)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bodney, David)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED in part to the extent that Defendant shall have until November 23, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. DENIED in part to the extent that the parties' requested an extension until December 7, 2018 for Defendant to answer. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 10/22/2018. (KEP)
October 18, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Thomas B Sullivan on behalf of Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 *Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Respond to Complaint re: #1 Complaint by Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bodney, David) *Modified on 10/19/2018 to correct motion type and add document linkage (ATD).
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC identifying Corporate Parents Hubbard Radio LLC, Corporate Parent Hubbard Radio Holdings LLC, and Corporate Parent Hubbard Broadcasting Incorporated for Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC. (Bodney, David) *Modified on 10/19/2018 to correct corporate parent names according to party name standards (ATD).
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jeremy Bodney on behalf of Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC. (Bodney, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Jennifer G Zipps. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-3084-PHX-JGZ. All deadlines are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on January 2, 2019. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/3/18. (JAMA)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/3/18. (JAMA)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC. (SIB). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO Form)(SIB)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16020745. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-3084-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Larry G Philpot. (Broberg, Lance) (SIB)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16020745 filed by Larry G Philpot. (Broberg, Lance) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit, G #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Certificate of Interested Persons)(SIB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G Philpot
Represented By: Timothy Christian Bode
Represented By: Lance Robert Broberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbard Radio Phoenix LLC
Represented By: Thomas Byrne Sullivan
Represented By: David Jeremy Bodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?