Karim v. American Airlines Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Hemayeth Karim
Defendant: Unknown Parties and American Airlines Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv03185
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: Eric J Markovich
2 Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extend Deadline for the Parties' Joint Rule 26(F) Case Management Report. The parties shall have an extension through and including November 30, 2018 to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 11/29/2018. (KEP)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Hemayeth Karim. (O'Connor, Eric)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Hemayeth Karim. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Samantha Josephine Kattau. (Kattau, Samantha)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 *MOTION for Extension of Time for the Parties to submit Joint Rule 26(F) Case Management Report by Hemayeth Karim. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Eric) *Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct event type (MSA).
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by American Airlines Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Courtney D. Casiano but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Robert B. Zelms. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant American Airlines Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER a telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held in the above entitled action on Wednesday, December 5, 2018 at 3:30 p.m., before United States Magistrate Judge Markovich's law clerk, Sara Demers. The parties shall file with the Court, on or before November 28, 2018, a joint report reflecting the results of their conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 11/7/2018. (See attached Order for details) (KEP)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Jennifer G Zipps and referred to Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich for all pretrial proceedings and a report and recommendation in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and L.R.Civ.P. 72.1 and 72.2. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-3185-PHX-JGZ-EM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by American Airlines Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Attached Complaint by American Airlines Incorporated.(Zelms, Robert)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER - Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. In accordance with the MIDP General Order, Defendant(s) must file a responsive pleading (an answer, counterclaim, crossclaim, and/or reply) within the time set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, irrespective of whether Defendant (s) intend to file a preliminary motion. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/9/18. (LAD)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16045952. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-3185-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Airlines Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert)(SIB)
October 5, 2018 ***STATE RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration and Complaint for Damages upon American Airlines on 8/6/2018. (SIB) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-007842. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16045952 filed by American Airlines Incorporated. (Zelms, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(SIB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karim v. American Airlines Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hemayeth Karim
Represented By: Eric P O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Bryan Zelms
Represented By: Courtney Dawn Casiano
Represented By: Samantha Josephine Kattau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?