Plastronics Socket Partners Limited et al v. Highrel Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Plastronics H-Pin Limited and Plastronics Socket Partners Limited
Defendant: Highrel Incorporated, Dong Weon Hwang, Paul Schubring and Hicon USA LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv03201
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plastronics H-Pin Limited, Plastronics Socket Partners Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brozynski, Katarzyna)
November 30, 2018 Filing 27 *NOTICE of Attorney Substitution (Titled:Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Matthew Chiarizio by Hicon USA LLC, Highrel Incorporated, Dong Weon Hwang, Paul Schubring. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew) *Modified to correct event on 12/3/2018 (REK).
November 27, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Paul Schubring. (Sivinski, Stephanie)
November 21, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE re: Service of Preliminary Order by Plastronics H-Pin Limited, Plastronics Socket Partners Limited re: #14 Order, Set Deadlines . (Brozynski, Katarzyna)
November 21, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Plastronics H-Pin Limited, Plastronics Socket Partners Limited. (Brozynski, Katarzyna)
November 20, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Jamie Raju on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #21 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Defendants HighRel, Inc., HiCon USA, LLC, and Paul Schubring's First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Response #19 is granted. Defendants HighRel, Inc., HiCon USA, LLC, and Paul Schubring's time to respond to the complaint is extended to 12/17/2018. No further extensions will be granted. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/16/2018. (LMR)
November 19, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Paul Schubring.(Sivinski, Stephanie)
November 19, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , by Paul Schubring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sivinski, Stephanie).
November 13, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for John Russell Emerson and Stephanie Sivinski on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hicon USA LLC, Highrel Incorporated, Paul Schubring. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
November 8, 2018 Filing 18 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dong Weon Hwang: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 10/10/2018 to Dong Weon Hwang. (Chiarizio, Matthew) *Modified to correct event on 11/9/2018 (REK).
November 7, 2018 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Plastronics H-Pin Limited, Plastronics Socket Partners Limited: Certificate of Service re: (2 copies) Summons; (2 copies) First Amended Complaint and Request for Injunction; (2 copies) Exhibits A-H; $25 Acceptance Fee Service for HiCon USA, LLC, served upon Arizona Corporation Commission on 10/30/2018. (Brozynski, Katarzyna)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Plastronics H-Pin Limited, Plastronics Socket Partners Limited: Certificate of Service re: (2 copies) Summons; (2 copies) First Amended Complaint and Request for Injunction; (2 copies) Exhibits A-H; $25 Acceptance Fee Service for HighRel, Inc., served upon Arizona Corporation Commission on 10/30/2018. (Brozynski, Katarzyna)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Plastronics H-Pin Limited, Plastronics Socket Partners Limited: Certificate of Service re: Summons; First Amended Complaint and Request for Injunction; Exhibits A-H upon Paul Schubring on 10/28/2018. (Brozynski, Katarzyna)
October 31, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Matthew P Chiarizio on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 25, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Antonio S Devora and Katarzyna Brozynski on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 24, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Bartholomew Dalton on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY ORDER: Plaintiff's must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than January 3, 2019. Plaintiffs must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendants and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 3, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/11/2018. (REK)
October 11, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Plastronics H-Pin Limited, Plastronics Socket Partners Limited. (Laureanti, Steven)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. ORDERED by random draw, this case is reassigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future filings in this case should now list the following case number: CV-18-03201-PHX-SPL. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 10/11/18. (MAP)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Request for Injunction against All Defendants filed by Plastronics Socket Partners Limited, Plastronics H-Pin Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Laureanti, Steven)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Plastronics H-Pin Limited, Plastronics Socket Partners Limited . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline)(Laureanti, Steven)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 8 Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). (BAR)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(BAR)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hicon USA LLC, Highrel Incorporated, Dong Weon Hwang, Paul Schubring. (Attachments: #1 HighRel, Inc., #2 Hwang, #3 Schubring)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16047496. This case has been assigned to the Honorable H Russel Holland. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-03201-PHX-HRH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Plastronics H-Pin Limited, Plastronics Socket Partners Limited. (Laureanti, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAR)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plastronics H-Pin Limited. (Laureanti, Steven) (BAR)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plastronics Socket Partners Limited.(Laureanti, Steven) (BAR)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16047496 filed by Plastronics Socket Partners Limited, Plastronics H-Pin Limited.(Laureanti, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(BAR) Modified on 10/9/2018 (BAR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plastronics Socket Partners Limited et al v. Highrel Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highrel Incorporated
Represented By: Jamie Raju
Represented By: Stephanie Noelle Sivinski
Represented By: John Russell Emerson
Represented By: Matthew Philip Chiarizio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dong Weon Hwang
Represented By: Jamie Raju
Represented By: Stephanie Noelle Sivinski
Represented By: John Russell Emerson
Represented By: Matthew Philip Chiarizio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Schubring
Represented By: Jamie Raju
Represented By: Stephanie Noelle Sivinski
Represented By: John Russell Emerson
Represented By: Matthew Philip Chiarizio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hicon USA LLC
Represented By: Jamie Raju
Represented By: Stephanie Noelle Sivinski
Represented By: John Russell Emerson
Represented By: Matthew Philip Chiarizio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plastronics H-Pin Limited
Represented By: Steven John Laureanti
Represented By: Antonio S Devora
Represented By: Katarzyna Brozynski
Represented By: Bartholomew Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plastronics Socket Partners Limited
Represented By: Steven John Laureanti
Represented By: Antonio S Devora
Represented By: Katarzyna Brozynski
Represented By: Bartholomew Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?