Expotech Engineering Incorporated v. Cardone Industries Incorporated

Plaintiff: Expotech Engineering Incorporated
Defendant: Cardone Industries Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv03221
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #23 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Expotech Engineering Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
November 23, 2018 Filing 23 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, RESPONSE to Motion re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by Expotech Engineering Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McGee, Robert) *Modified text on 11/26/2018 (REK).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is further ordered that Cardone may file an answer and/or counterclaims within 30 days of the Court issuing its order deciding Cardone's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 11/8/2018. (BAR)
November 8, 2018 Filing 21 *NOTICE of Compliance re: #12 Order by Cardone Industries Incorporated with Court's Order. (Biles, Charles) *Modified to add document link on 11/9/2018 (REK).
November 8, 2018 Filing 20 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Cardone Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Defer Deadline to File Responsive Pleading)(Biles, Charles) *Modified to correct motion type and add document link on 11/9/2018 (REK).
November 8, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania by Cardone Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Exhibits and Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Declaration of George Dunham, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Declaration of Cheree Maurer-DaSilva, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Dismissing Case)(Biles, Charles)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Exceed Page Limits for a Motion to Dismiss. The page limit for Defendants motion to dismiss shall be extended to twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 11/2/2018. (BAR)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Expotech Engineering Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibits 1-3, Civil Cover Sheet, Verification, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice re: MIDP upon Cardone Industries, Inc. on 10-18-2018. (McGee, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Notice of Compliance with The Court's October 18, 2018 Order by Cardone Industries Incorporated re: #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 MOTION Enlarge Page Limitation , #13 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel . (Biles, Charles)
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 *MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cardone Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Enlarging Page Limitation)(Biles, Charles) *Modified motion type on 11/5/2018 (REK).
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardone Industries Incorporated. (Biles, Charles)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Dunham Biles on behalf of Cardone Industries Incorporated. (Biles, Charles)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Informational ORDER re Communication with the Court, Dispositive Motions, Proposed Orders, Paper Copies, Exhibits, Authority Binders, and Emailing Documents. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 10/17/2018. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.)(BAR)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information by Plaintiff Expotech Engineering Incorporated. (McGee, Robert) *Modified to correct event on 10/17/2018 (REK).
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge James A. Soto. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-3221-PHX-JAS. All deadlines and hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY ORDER: Plaintiff must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than January 7, 2019. The Plaintiff must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 7, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/10/2018. (REK)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121 form)(BAC)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Expotech Engineering Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cardone Industries Incorporated. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16052776. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03221-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Expotech Engineering Incorporated. (McGee, Robert) (BAC)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Expotech Engineering Incorporated. (BAC)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16052776 filed by Expotech Engineering Incorporated. (McGee, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Verification)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Expotech Engineering Incorporated v. Cardone Industries Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardone Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Charles Dunham Biles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Expotech Engineering Incorporated
Represented By: Robert James McGee
Represented By: John Charles Mascari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?