Koch v. Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: James Koch, Jr.
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2018cv03293
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #6 Order regarding submitting the filing fee, the civil case is terminated This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that unless Plaintiff pays the filing fee in full on or before November 1, 2018 the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/18/2018. (REK)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (JJH)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (JJH)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number:CV-18-3293-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JJH)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James Koch, Jr. (JJH)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Koch, Jr.(JJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koch v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Koch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?