Brewer v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lidia Brewer
Defendant: Viad Corporation, Devon Energy Corporation, Pfizer Incorporated, Ingersoll-Rand Company, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, Morgan Engineering Incorporated, William Powell Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated, Warren Pumps LLC, Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, General Electric Company, Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California, J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated, Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP, CNH Industrial America LLC, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, ITT Corporation, IMO Industries Incorporated, Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated, Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated, Gardner Denver Incorporated, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Crane Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Caterpillar Global Mining LLC, FMC Corporation, Thrush Company Incorporated, Velan Valve Corporation, Cooper Industries LLC, Cameron International Corporation, Honeywell International Incorporated, Pennzoil-Quaker State Company, Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated, Caterpillar Incorporated, CBS Corporation, AutoZone West LLC, Terex Corporation, McNally Industries LLC, Amtrol Incorporated, Clark Equipment Company, Bobcat Company, Pennzoil-Quaker State Company sued individually and as formerly doing business as Esperanza Mine successor in interest Duval Corporation formerly known as Pennzoil Products Company, Elliott Company formerly known as Elliott Turbomachinery Company doing business as Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Elliott Turbomachinery Company, CNH America LLC, P&H Mining Equipment Incorporated, Viacom Incorporated, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company sued as successor to Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company formerly doing business as Esperanza Mine, Cooper Industries LLC formerly doing business as Gardner-Denver Industrial Machinery, Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP formerly doing business as Link-Belt Construction Equipment Company LP LLLP, Northern Fire Apparatus Company, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Pennzoil Products Company, ITT Industries Incorporated, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC sued individually and as successor in interest CSK Auto Incorporated doing business as Checkers Auto Parts, Dial Corporation, Cooper Cameron Corporation, Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated sued individually and as doing business as Cyprus Sierrita Corporation formerly doing business as Esperanza Mine successor in interest Cyprus Sierrita Corporation, Devon Energy Corporation sued individualy and as formerly doing business as Esperanza Mine successor in interest Pennzoil United Incorporated successor in interest Duval Corporation, Atwood & Morrill, Autozone West Incorporated, Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Freeport-McMoran Copper & Gold Incorporated formerly doing business as Esperanza Mine doing business as Cyprus Sierrita Corporation, Allied-Signal Incorporated, Clark Equipment Company doing business as Bobcat Company and Bucyrus-Erie Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv03339
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Referring Judge: Roslyn O Silver
2 Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 332 REQUEST re: Removal from ECF Notification by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Bressler, Stephen)
January 8, 2021 Filing 331 REQUEST re: for Removal from ECF Notification by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Heitz, Amanda)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting the parties' #329 Stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dispositive motions shall be filed no later than March 1, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED any Daubert motion relevant to a dispositive motion shall be filed no later than March 1, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED all remaining Daubert motions shall be filed no later than June 17, 2021 or 30 days following the resolution of dispositive motions, whichever is later. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Rule 16 Interim Status Conference set for January 20, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/7/2021. (CLB)
December 30, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joseph Stuart Pevsner on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 29, 2020 Filing 329 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation by The Remaining Parties to Amend Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline and Clarify The Daubert Motion Filing Deadline by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
December 29, 2020 Filing 328 STATUS REPORT Joint by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #326 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. only, each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/21/2020. (CLB)
December 21, 2020 Filing 326 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heitz, Amanda)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #324 Stipulation of Dismissal. Defendant Flowserve US, Inc., sued as successor to Edward Valve, Inc., is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/15/2020. (CLB)
December 15, 2020 Filing 324 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Flowserve US, Inc. by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Interim Status Conference, presently set for January 5, 2021 at 10:00AM is VACATED and RESET on January 20, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. This hearing will be telephonic. Counsel for Plaintiff will arrange for the conference call. Once all parties are on the line, call Chambers at 602-322-7520 for the call to be forwarded to the courtroom.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Joint Status Report will continue to be due December 29, 2020. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. (ROS, rc)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
November 18, 2020 Filing 322 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #311 Order regarding filing a stipulation of dismissal and no stipulation having been filed, party Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation is terminated.(DXD)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER granting the #320 Joint Stipulation. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. only, each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/6/2020. (CLB)
November 5, 2020 Filing 320 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Caterpillar, Inc. by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting #317 Stipulation for Extension of Deadline for Honeywell International to Disclose Expert Opinions. Honeywell International's deadline to disclose the expert opinions of Dr. David Garabrant only is extended to 10/25/2020. The deadlines for rebuttal expert disclosures and expert depositions relating to Dr. Garabrant shall not be extended except upon motion and for good cause shown. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/8/2020. (CLB)
October 8, 2020 Filing 318 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
October 8, 2020 Filing 317 STIPULATION for Extension of Deadline for Honeywell to Disclose Expert Opinions by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, J)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #314 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Viad Corp only, each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/8/2020. (CLB)
October 8, 2020 Filing 315 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
October 8, 2020 Filing 314 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Viad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, J)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #312 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. only, each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/5/2020. (CLB)
October 5, 2020 Filing 312 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant, J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER re: #310 Notice of Settlement: IT IS ORDERED the Clerk of Court shall dismiss with prejudice Foster Wheeler only without further notice on November 2, 2020, unless prior thereto a Stipulation to Dismiss, along with a form of order, or request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar, is filed herein. Each party will bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/2/2020. (CLB)
October 2, 2020 Filing 310 NOTICE of Settlement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Roberts, Daniel)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #308 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant CBS Corporation (N/K/A ViacomCBS) only, each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/11/2020. (CLB)
August 11, 2020 Filing 308 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant CBS Corporation (n/k/a ViacomCBS) by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herzog, Lindsey)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #305 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the deadline for Defendant(s) to provide full and complete expert disclosures, as required by Rule 26(a)(2)(A)-(C) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, is now October 8, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the deadline for rebuttal expert disclosures, if any, shall be made not later than November 20, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED expert depositions shall be completed not later than December 23, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Interim Rule 16 Status Conference previously set for 10:00 a.m. on December 15, 2020 is VACATED and RESET to January 5, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The Joint Status Report shall be filed by December 29, 2020. All other deadlines set forth in the Amended Case Management Order (Doc. #272 ) remain the same. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/31/2020. (CLB)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting #304 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant IMO Industries Inc. only, each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/31/2020. (CLB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 305 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to extend certain deadlines) by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, J)
July 31, 2020 Filing 304 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant IMO Industries Inc. Only with Prejudice by IMO Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Dismissal with Prejudice of IMO Industries Only)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting #301 Stipulation to Dismiss Party. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant William Powell Company only. Each party will bear their own costs and fees.Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/23/2020. (CLB)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting #299 #300 Stipulations of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Velan Valve Corporation only. Each party will bear their own costs and fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Stipulation (Doc. 300) is GRANTED. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Amtrol Inc., individually, and as successor in interest to Thrush Company and H.A. Thrush Company only. Each party will bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/22/2020. (CLB)
July 23, 2020 Filing 301 *STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party William Powell Company by William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boblick, Jason) *Modified to correct event on 7/24/2020 (DXD).
July 22, 2020 Filing 300 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Amtrol Inc. Only Without Prejudice by Amtrol Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
July 22, 2020 Filing 299 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Velan Valve Corporation Only Without Prejudice by Velan Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER the Stipulation #295 is STRICKEN as duplicative of Doc. #296 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Stipulation #296 is GRANTED. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company only. Each party will bear their own costs and fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Stipulation #297 is GRANTED. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California only. Each party will bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/16/2020. (CLB)
July 16, 2020 Filing 297 STIPULATION of Dismissal of PEP-BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 296 STIPULATION of Dismissal of INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 295 *STRIKEN per Doc. #298 - STIPULATION of Dismissal of INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified on 7/16/2020 to reflect document stricken (CLB).
July 13, 2020 Filing 294 REQUEST re: Request to be Removed from Service List as to Defendant Joy Global Surface Mining, Inc., Only by Defendant Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated. (Meyer, Cassandra)
July 9, 2020 Filing 293 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #291 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Forms of Papers. Please note for future filings; Attorney filing information must be typed in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the claims against Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company only are STAYED and will be dismissed without further notice on September 7, 2020, unless the Court is advised that the bankruptcy stay has been lifted, or a request for a lifting of the bankruptcy stay has not been ruled upon by the bankruptcy court. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/8/2020. (LAD)
July 8, 2020 Filing 291 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Aldrich (IR) Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Stay of Proceedings by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 4, 2020 Filing 290 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendants O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #288 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Joy Global Surface Mining Inc. only. Each party shall bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 6/2/2020. (CLB)
June 2, 2020 Filing 288 STIPULATION of Dismissal of JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING INC. by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 29, 2020 Filing 287 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) Defendant Air& Liquid Systems Corporation's First Supplemental Responses To Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project Requests filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (O'Daniel, David)
May 28, 2020 Filing 286 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
May 28, 2020 Filing 285 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by William Powell Company First Supplemental Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery. (Boblick, Jason)
May 28, 2020 Filing 284 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by William Powell Company First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Special Interrogatories. (Boblick, Jason)
May 28, 2020 Filing 283 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Service of Final Supplemental MIDP Responses filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Roberts, Daniel)
May 28, 2020 Filing 282 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Viad Corporation. (Sparks, J)
May 26, 2020 Filing 281 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Trane Technologies plc for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting #277 #278 #279 Stipulations of Dismissal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Morgan Engineering Incorporated, CNH Industrial America LLC and Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP terminated are dismissed. Each party will bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/30/2020. (CLB)
April 29, 2020 Filing 279 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiffs and by Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crown, Larry)
April 29, 2020 Filing 278 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiffs and by CNH Industrial America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crown, Larry)
April 28, 2020 Filing 277 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Morgan Engineering, Inc. Only by Morgan Engineering Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Re: Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Morgan Engineering, Inc. Only)(Mear, Richard)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #275 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Pfizer, Inc. only. Each party will bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/20/20. (CLB)
March 20, 2020 Filing 275 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Pfizer, Inc. with Prejudice by Pfizer Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting #273 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendants Gardner Denver, Inc., formerly d/b/a Gardner-Denver Industrial Machinery, and Cooper Industries, LLC only. Each party will bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/5/20. (CLB)
February 5, 2020 Filing 273 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Gardner Denver Only by Gardner Denver Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal of Gardner Denver)(Petri, Shawn)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 272 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting #271 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. Fact Discovery due by 5/28/2020. Dispositive motions due by 1/29/2021. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/17/2021. Joint Status Report due by 12/8/2020. Interim Status Conference set for 12/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/24/20. (CLB)
January 21, 2020 Filing 271 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines to Scheduling Order pursuant to LRCIV 7.3 by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 270 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Amtrol Incorporated. (Hendricks, John)
January 15, 2020 Filing 269 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Viad Corporation. (Sparks, J)
January 15, 2020 Filing 268 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
January 14, 2020 Filing 267 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
January 14, 2020 Filing 266 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated. (Stafford, Karen)
January 14, 2020 Filing 265 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Roberts, Daniel)
January 13, 2020 Filing 264 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed December 11, 2019, the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants Elliot Company and ITT Corporation only. (DXD)
January 3, 2020 Filing 263 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #262 Notice of Service of Discovery filed by William Powell Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
January 3, 2020 Filing 262 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 1/6/2020 (SST).
January 3, 2020 Filing 261 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #259 Notice of Service of Discovery. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
January 2, 2020 Filing 260 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Roberts, Daniel)
January 2, 2020 Filing 259 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by AutoZone West LLC. (Romano, Carol)
December 30, 2019 Filing 258 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 257 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting #253 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant General Electric Company only, each party to bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/17/19. (CLB)
December 17, 2019 Filing 255 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by FMC Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
December 17, 2019 Filing 254 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP. (Crown, Larry)
December 17, 2019 Filing 253 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant General Electric Company Only by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal as to General Electric Company Only)(Roberts, Daniel)
December 17, 2019 Filing 252 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by FMC Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
December 17, 2019 Filing 251 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by McNally Industries LLC. (Crown, Larry)
December 16, 2019 Filing 250 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated. (Stafford, Karen)
December 12, 2019 Filing 249 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Gardner Denver Incorporated. (Petri, Shawn)
December 12, 2019 Filing 248 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Gardner Denver Incorporated.(Petri, Shawn)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice without further notice on 1/10/2020, unless prior thereto a Stipulation to Dismiss, along with a form of order, or request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar, is filed herein. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/11/2019. (MMO)
December 11, 2019 Filing 246 NOTICE of Settlement by ITT Corporation. (Sparks, J)
December 11, 2019 Filing 245 NOTICE of Settlement by Elliott Company. (Sparks, J)
December 10, 2019 Filing 244 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
December 10, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (O'Daniel, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 242 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Heitz, Amanda)
December 9, 2019 Filing 241 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed November 6, 2019, judgment of dismissal with prejudice is entered as to Defendant Goulds Pumps LLC only. (DXD)
December 5, 2019 Filing 240 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
December 5, 2019 Filing 239 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Viad Corporation. (Sparks, J)
December 4, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ronald Lyle Hellbusch on behalf of Defendant Cooper Industries LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 4, 2019 Filing 238 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
December 2, 2019 Filing 237 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 2, 2019 Filing 236 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Morgan Engineering Incorporated. (Mear, Richard)
December 2, 2019 Filing 235 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (O'Daniel, David)
December 2, 2019 Filing 234 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 2, 2019 Filing 233 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CNH Industrial America LLC. (Crown, Larry)
December 2, 2019 Filing 232 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Roberts, Daniel)
December 2, 2019 Filing 231 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 230 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
November 27, 2019 Filing 229 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
November 27, 2019 Filing 228 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by FMC Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
November 27, 2019 Filing 227 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP. (Crown, Larry)
November 27, 2019 Filing 226 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by McNally Industries LLC. (Crown, Larry)
November 27, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Caterpillar Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
November 27, 2019 Filing 224 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
November 27, 2019 Filing 223 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
November 26, 2019 Filing 222 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CBS Corporation. (Herzog, Lindsey)
November 26, 2019 Filing 221 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Roberts, Daniel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 220 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Cooper Industries LLC.(Petri, Shawn)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #218 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Caterpillar Global Mining, LLC only. Each party will bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/15/19. (CLB)
November 15, 2019 Filing 218 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Caterpillar Global Mining LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broerman, Kevin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 217 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER re: #214 Notice of Settlement - IT IS ORDERED the Clerk of Court shall enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice without further notice on December 6, 2019, unless prior thereto a Stipulation to Dismiss, along with a form of order, or request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar is filed herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED all pending motions as to Goulds Pumps LLC only are denied with leave to reinstate should this matter fail to finalize. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/6/19. (LAD)
November 5, 2019 Filing 215 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant CNH Industrial America LLC. (Crown, Larry)
November 5, 2019 Filing 214 NOTICE of Settlement by Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
October 29, 2019 Filing 213 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Morgan Engineering Incorporated. (Mear, Richard)
October 22, 2019 Filing 212 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CBS Corporation. (Bressler, Stephen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 211 REPORT of PLAINTIFFS DISCLOSURE OF BANKRUPTCY FILINGS PURSUANT TO ARS 12-782 by Plaintiff Lidia Brewer. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 210 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #202 , #203 , #204 , #205 and #206 Notices. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Documents #202 , #203 , #204 and #205 signed by attorney John C. Hendricks but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Kathleen L. Beiermeister. Document #206 signed by attorney Carol M. Romano but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Mitchell Resnick. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
July 31, 2019 Filing 209 Joinder in Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendants CNH Industrial America LLC, Caterpillar Incorporated, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, Gardner Denver Incorporated, J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated, Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP, McNally Industries LLC. (Crown, Larry)
July 31, 2019 Filing 208 NOTICE re: Defendant CBS Corporation's Notice of Nonparties at Fault by CBS Corporation . (Bressler, Stephen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 207 NOTICE re: Defendant The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California's Notice of Non-Parties at Fault and Joinder in Defendants' Notices of Non-Parties at Fault by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California . (Murphy, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 206 NOTICE re: Defendant AutoZone's Joinder in Air & Liquid Systems Corp's and Ingersoll-Rand's Notice of NonParties at Fault by AutoZone West LLC re: #190 Notice (Other), #183 Notice (Other) . (Resnick, Mitchell)
July 31, 2019 Filing 205 NOTICE re: RE NONPARTIES AT FAULT by IMO Industries Incorporated . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 204 NOTICE re: RE NONPARTIES AT FAULT by Pfizer Incorporated . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 203 NOTICE re: NonParties at Fault by Velan Valve Corporation . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 202 NOTICE re: of Non-Parties at Fault by Amtrol Incorporated . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE re: Joinder in Notices of NonParties at Fault by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated . (Heitz, Amanda)
July 31, 2019 Filing 200 NOTICE re: Non-Parties At Fault by Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated . (Stafford, Karen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE re: Joinder to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's Notice of Nonparties at Fault by Morgan Engineering Incorporated . (Mear, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 198 NOTICE re: Joinder Non-Parties at Fault by Viad Corporation . (Sparks, J)
July 31, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE re: Joinder Non-Parties at Fault by ITT Corporation . (Sparks, J)
July 31, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE re: Joinder Non-Parties at Fault by Honeywell International Incorporated . (Sparks, J)
July 31, 2019 Filing 195 NOTICE re: Joinder Non-Parties at Fault by Goulds Pumps Incorporated . (Sparks, J)
July 31, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE re: Joinder Non-Parties at Fault by Elliott Company . (Sparks, J)
July 31, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation . (Lite, Jeremy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Warren Pumps LLC . (Hendricks, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Crane Company . (Hendricks, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Ingersoll-Rand Company . (Hendricks, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 189 NOTICE re: Non-Party At Fault by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated . (Boblick, Jason)
July 31, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE re: Non-Party At Fault by William Powell Company . (Boblick, Jason)
July 30, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE re: of Non-Parties at Fault by Caterpillar Global Mining LLC . (Broerman, Kevin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #184 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 83.3(b) Appearance by Attorney. Please note for future filings; No Attorney shall be permitted to withdraw/substitute except by formal written order of the Court. NO FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD) *Modified to remove action text on 7/26/2019 (DXD).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER re: #184 Notice of Attorney Substitution. IT IS ORDERED approving the parties' Stipulation to Substitute Counsel as to Defendant Pfizer. Attorney John C. Hendricks, retained, is substituted in place of Attorney Larry J. Crown, retained, for all further proceedings. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 7/25/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
July 25, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: John C. Hendricks appearing for Pfizer Incorporated. Attorney Larry Jay Crown terminated. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE re: DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF NONPARTIES AT FAULT by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation . (O'Daniel, David)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: Clark Equipment Company and Bobcat Company were not listed in the caption of the complaint but were listed in the body of the complaint. Those two companies are also listed as defendants on the electronic docket. The parties' Joint Case Management Report, however, did not list either company. (Doc. #159 ). Therefore, it is unclear whether Plaintiffs ever intended for these two companies to be separate defendants. To the extent Plaintiffs intended to name the two companies as defendants, Plaintiffs have not completed service of process. Therefore, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), Clark Equipment Company and Bobcat Company are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to serve. Defendant Thrush Company has also not been served and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 7/16/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 181 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Lite, Jeremy)
July 15, 2019 Filing 180 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Cassandra Victoria Meyer. (Meyer, Cassandra)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #178 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. All claims filed in this action as to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company only, will be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/20/19. (CLB)
May 15, 2019 Filing 178 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Egbert, Alexander)
April 22, 2019 **NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant AutoZone West LLC. **Doc. #177 is being re-docketed using the correct event for statistical purposes.** (DXD)
April 22, 2019 Filing 177 *NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) by Defendant AutoZone West LLC. (Romano, Carol) *Modified to correct event on 4/23/2019 (DXD).
April 9, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: David T. Lundmark appearing for Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. Attorney Cameron Aaron Arthur terminated. . (Lundmark, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 175 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation: Gordn Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP, Two North Central Avenue, Suite 2200, Phoenix, AZ 85004. (O'Daniel, David)
April 4, 2019 Filing 174 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint by AutoZone West LLC.(Romano, Carol)
April 1, 2019 Filing 173 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AutoZone West LLC. (Romano, Carol)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that AutoZone West LLC shall file its Corporate Disclosure Statement no later than close of business on Friday, April 5, 2019. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 4/1/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
March 14, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Caterpillar Global Mining LLC. (Broerman, Kevin)
March 12, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AutoZone West LLC. (CLB)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 *AMENDED by Doc. #272 - SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Dispositive motions due by 10/31/2020. Status Report due by 10/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/19/2021. See Order for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/11/19. (DXD) *Modified on 1/24/2020 (CLB).
March 11, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Arthur, Cameron)
March 4, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 166 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Plaintiff Lidia Brewer. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Herzog, Lindsey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 164 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver: Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2019. Discussion held re: subject matter jurisdiction. Dates discussed. Counsel are directed to submit a revised Rule 16 Order to chambers by 3/1/2019. An Interim Scheduling Conference is set for 10/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. Status Report due by 10/3/2020. APPEARANCES: Jordan Blumenfeld-James for Plaintiff. J. Steven Sparks for Defendants Elliott, Gould Pumps, Honeywell International, Viad and ITT. Daniel Roberts for Defendants Foster Wheeler Energy and General Electric. Cassandra Meyer for Defendant Joy Global Surface Mining. David O'Daniel for Defendant Air & Liquid Systems. John Hendricks and Kathleen Beiermeister for Defendants Amtrol, Crane, Velan Valve, Warren Pumps, IMO Industries and Ingersoll-Rand. Cassandra Meyer for Defendant Joy Global Surface Mining. Nathan Anderson standing in for Larry Crown for Defendants Caterpillar, CNH Industrial America, Flowserve US, FMC, Gardner Denver, J.T. Thorpe & Son, Link-Belt Cranes LP, McNally Industries and Pfizer. Richard Mear for Defendant Morgan Engineering. Jason Boblick for Defendants O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, O'Reilly Automotive Stores and William Powell. Robert Murphy for Defendant Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. Amanda Heitz and William Auther for Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA. Dane Dodd standing in for Carol Romano for Defendant AutoZone West. Kevin Broerman for Defendant Caterpillar Global Mining. Lindsey Herzog for Defendant CBS. (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) Hearing held 2:07 PM to 2:32 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
February 21, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Jay Crown on behalf of CNH Industrial America LLC, Caterpillar Incorporated, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, Gardner Denver Incorporated, J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated, Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP, McNally Industries LLC, Pfizer Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER: In anticipation of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference tomorrow, the parties are ordered to be prepared to argue and establish this Court's subject matter jurisdiction over the case. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 2/20/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
February 20, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AutoZone West LLC. (CLB)
February 15, 2019 Filing 160 First Amended ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated.(Arthur, Cameron)
February 14, 2019 Filing 159 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Case Management Report filed by Plaintiff Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Rule 16 Scheduling Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Amtrol Incorporated. (Hendricks, John)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting the #128 #140 Motions to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing without prejudice all claims filed in this action against Defendants Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc., Freeport-McMoRan Sierrita Inc., and Cyprus Amax Minerals Company only. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/13/19. (CLB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Pfizer Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
February 11, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Caterpillar Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
February 8, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Gardner Denver Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
February 8, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
February 7, 2019 Filing 152 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Weir Group PLC as a corporate parent by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Arthur, Cameron) *Modified record on 2/8/2019 (DXD).
February 7, 2019 Filing 151 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Arthur, Cameron)
February 7, 2019 Filing 150 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated.(Arthur, Cameron)
February 6, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Kathleen L Beiermeister. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 31, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #146 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by William Powell Company, #147 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
January 31, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason)
January 31, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
January 30, 2019 Filing 145 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
January 21, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) on behalf of its former Northern Pump Business filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
January 21, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) on behalf of Construction Equipment Group filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
January 21, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP. (Crown, Larry)
January 21, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant McNally Industries LLC. (Crown, Larry)
January 18, 2019 Filing 140 MOTION to Dismiss Party Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc.; Freeport-McMoRan Sierrita, Inc; Cyprus Amax Minerals Company by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated, Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maraz, Thomas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Pfizer Incorporated.Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline still set as to AutoZone West LLC. (DXD)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 2/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/9/19. (CLB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 137 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Pfizer Incorporated.(Crown, Larry)
January 11, 2019 Filing 136 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation, Other Affiliate Edward Valves, Inc. for Flowserve US Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
January 11, 2019 Filing 135 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Flowserve US Incorporated.(Crown, Larry)
January 10, 2019 Filing 134 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Gardner Denver Holdings Incorporated, Corporate Parent KKR & Company LP for Gardner Denver Incorporated. (Crown, Larry) *Modified record on 1/11/2019 (DXD).
January 10, 2019 Filing 133 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Gardner Denver Incorporated.(Crown, Larry)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2019 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow is VACATED and will be reset by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
January 8, 2019 Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER: This case is directly reassigned to Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-3339-PHX-ROS. Any pending hearings and/or deadlines are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
January 7, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated. (Meyer, Cassandra)
January 4, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 3, 2019 Filing 128 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Phelps Dodge Industries, Inc., Freeport-McMoRan Sierrita Inc., and Cyprus Amax Minerals Company by Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Hannah)
December 28, 2018 Filing 127 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP identifying Corporate Parent Sumitomo Heavy Industries Limited for Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP. (Crown, Larry) *Modified record on 12/28/2018 (DXD).
December 28, 2018 Filing 126 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McNally Industries LLC. (Crown, Larry)
December 28, 2018 Filing 125 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
December 27, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Heather Neubauer on behalf of defendants IMO Industries Incorporated and Warren Pumps LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 21, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Tilleman, Karl)
December 20, 2018 Filing 123 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CNH Industrial America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Case New Holland Industrial Incorporated, CNH Industrial US Holdings Incorporated, CNH Industrial NV, Other Affiliate Borsa Italiana SpA. (Crown, Larry) *Modified record on 12/21/2018 (DXD).
December 19, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to CNH Industrial America LLC. (DXD)
December 19, 2018 Filing 121 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by CNH Industrial America LLC.(Crown, Larry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP and McNally Industries LLC. (DXD)
December 18, 2018 Filing 119 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP.(Crown, Larry)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #113 Stipulation of Dismissal: Devon Energy Corporation is terminated, with each party to bear their own fees and costs in connection with this action. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/18/1888. (DXD)
December 18, 2018 Filing 117 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by McNally Industries LLC.(Crown, Larry)
December 17, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Lidia Brewer. Party Pennzoil-Quaker State Company (sued individually and as) terminated. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to FMC Corporation. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline still pending as to AutoZone West LLC.(DXD)
December 14, 2018 Filing 114 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by FMC Corporation.(Crown, Larry)
December 13, 2018 Filing 113 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Devon Energy Corporation by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re: Stipulation for Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant, Devon Energy Corporation)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 112 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Terra Millennium Corporation for J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
December 12, 2018 Filing 111 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated.(Crown, Larry)
December 12, 2018 Filing 110 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Tilleman, Karl)
December 12, 2018 Filing 109 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying MetLife Incorporated as a Corporate Parent by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Tilleman, Karl) *Modified record on 12/12/2018 (DXD).
December 11, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Elliott Company. (Sparks, J)
December 10, 2018 Filing 107 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
December 10, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Caterpillar Incorporated. (DXD)
December 7, 2018 Filing 105 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Caterpillar Incorporated.(Crown, Larry) *Modified to reflect incorrect case caption. Attorney notified on 12/10/2018 (DXD).
December 7, 2018 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Komatsu Mining Corporation, Komatsu America Corporation, Komatsu Limited as Corporate Parents by Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated. (Meyer, Cassandra) *Modified record on 12/10/2018 (DXD).
December 7, 2018 Filing 103 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint by Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated.(Meyer, Cassandra)
December 6, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 4, 2018 Filing 101 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lidia Brewer: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint; Civil Case Court Information Case History; Case Management Order; Civil Case Cover Sheet; and Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet upon MCNALLEY INDUSTRIES, LLC on November 28, 2018. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 100 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lidia Brewer: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint; Civil Case Court Information Case History; Case Management Order; Civil Case Cover Sheet; and Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet upon LINK-BELT CRANES, L.P. LLP on November 20, 2018. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 99 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lidia Brewer: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint; Civil Case Court Information Case History; Case Management Order; Civil Case Cover Sheet; and Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet upon FLOWSERVE US, INC. on November 21, 2018. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 98 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lidia Brewer: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint; Civil Case Court Information Case History; Case Management Order; Civil Case Cover Sheet; and Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet upon DEVON ENERGY CORPORATION on November 21, 2018. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 97 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lidia Brewer: Affidavit of Service re: First Amended Complaint; Civil Case Court Information Case History; Case Management Order; Civil Case Cover Sheet; and Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet upon COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC on November 28, 2018. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 96 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lidia Brewer: Proof of Service re: First Amended Complaint; Civil Case Court Information Case History; Case Management Order; Civil Case Cover Sheet; and Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet upon AMTROL, INC. on November 21, 2018. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (O'Daniel, David)
November 30, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #91 Answer to Amended Complaint, #92 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #93 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Documents signed by attorney Jason J Boblick but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Tom Shorall Jr. Additionally, document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Forms of Papers. Please note for future filings; Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
November 30, 2018 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying O'Reilly Automotive Incorporated as a Corporate Parent by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC. (Shorall, Thomas) *Modified record on 12/3/2018 (DXD).
November 30, 2018 Filing 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying O'Reilly Automotive Incorporated as a Corporate Parent by O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated. (Shorall, Thomas) *Modified record on 12/3/2018 (DXD).
November 30, 2018 Filing 91 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated.(Shorall, Thomas)
November 29, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Bressler, Stephen)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #74 Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims: Plaintiff's claim against Ingersoll-Rand Company as successor-in-interest to Terry Steam Turbine Company only, without prejudice. All other claims are expressly reserved, and no other claims are affected by or subject to this Order, with each party to bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/28/18. (DXD)
November 27, 2018 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
November 27, 2018 Filing 87 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by William Powell Company.(Boblick, Jason)
November 26, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Morgan Engineering Incorporated. (Mear, Richard)
November 26, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Hendricks, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Lidia Brewer. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 83 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #81 Answer to Amended Complaint, #82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Amtrol Incorporated. (Hendricks, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amtrol Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate Worthington Industries, Inc. for Amtrol Incorporated. (Hendricks, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 81 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Amtrol Incorporated.(Hendricks, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Defendant Caterpillar Global Mining LLC. (Broerman, Kevin)
November 19, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wayne Mear on behalf of Morgan Engineering Incorporated. (Mear, Richard)
November 19, 2018 Filing 78 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #74 Stipulation of Dismissal (Text of Proposed Order) by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Hendricks, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated, Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated. (Porter, Hannah)
November 16, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Roberts, Daniel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant General Electric Company. (Roberts, Daniel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 74 *STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Claims without Prejudice by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John) *Modified to reflect wrong pdf attachment. Attorney notified on 11/19/2018 (DXD).
November 15, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #33 Stipulation of Dismissal: Defendant Union Carbide Corporation is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/13/18. (DXD)
November 9, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #70 Amended Answer to Complaint. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
November 9, 2018 Filing 70 AMENDED ANSWER to First #30 Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (O'Daniel, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morgan Engineering Incorporated. (Mear, Richard)
November 5, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #61 and #63 Answer to Amended Complaint. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Documents signed by attorney John Hendricks but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Kathleen Beiermeister. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
November 5, 2018 Filing 67 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated.(Maraz, Thomas)
November 5, 2018 Filing 66 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company.(Maraz, Thomas)
November 5, 2018 Filing 65 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated.(Maraz, Thomas)
November 5, 2018 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
November 5, 2018 Filing 63 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
November 5, 2018 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent IMO Holdings Incorporated, Corporate Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC for IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen) *Modified record on 11/6/2018 (DXD).
November 5, 2018 Filing 61 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO Industries Incorporated.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
November 5, 2018 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent IMO Industries Incorporated and Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) *Modified record on 11/6/2018 (DXD).
November 5, 2018 Filing 59 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps LLC.(Hendricks, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 58 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Crane Company.(Hendricks, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (O'Daniel, David) *Modified record on 11/6/2018 (DXD).
November 2, 2018 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar IPX LLC by Caterpillar Global Mining LLC. (Broerman, Kevin) *Modified record on 11/6/2018 (DXD).
November 2, 2018 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parents Dow Chemical Company and DowDuPont Incorporated by Union Carbide Corporation. (Petri, Shawn) *Modified record on 11/6/2018 (DXD).
November 1, 2018 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate ITT LLC by ITT Corporation. (Sparks, J) *Modified record on 11/2/2018 (DXD).
November 1, 2018 Filing 53 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by ITT Corporation.(Sparks, J) Modified to reflect incorrect case caption. Attorney notified on 11/2/2018 (DXD).
November 1, 2018 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Elliott Group Holdings Incorporated and Ebara Corporation by Elliott Company. (Sparks, J) *Modified record on 11/2/2018 (DXD).
November 1, 2018 Filing 51 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant Foster Wheeler Corporation's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Roberts, Daniel)
November 1, 2018 Filing 50 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant General Electric Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by General Electric Company.(Roberts, Daniel)
November 1, 2018 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ITT Incorporated by Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (Sparks, J) *Modified record on 11/2/2018 (DXD).
November 1, 2018 Filing 48 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Goulds Pumps Incorporated.(Sparks, J)
October 31, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #40 Answer to Amended Complaint. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
October 31, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Caterpillar Global Mining LLC, Elliott Company. (DXD)
October 31, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Elliott Company.(Sparks, J)
October 31, 2018 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company identifying Corporate Parent Freeport Minerals Corporation and Other Affiliate Freeport-McMoran Incorporated for Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Maraz, Thomas) *Modified record on 11/1/2018 (DXD).
October 31, 2018 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated identifying Corporate Parents Cuprus Climax Metals Company, Cyprus Metals Company, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company and Freeport Minerals Corporation and Other Affiliate Freeport-McMoran Incorporated for Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated. (Maraz, Thomas) *Modified record on 11/1/2018 (DXD).
October 31, 2018 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Freeport Minerals Corporation and Other Affiliate Freeport-McMoran Incorporated for Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated. (Maraz, Thomas) *Modified record on 11/1/2018 (DXD).
October 31, 2018 Filing 41 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Caterpillar Global Mining LLC.(Broerman, Kevin) *Modified to reflect incorrect case caption. Attorney on 11/1/2018 (DXD).
October 31, 2018 Filing 40 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(O'Daniel, David)
October 30, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Jordan Blumenfeld-James on behalf of plaintiff Brewer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 29, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to CBS Corporation. (DXD)
October 29, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT by CBS Corporation.(Bressler, Stephen) *Modified to reflect incorrect case caption. Attorney notified on 10/30/2018 (DXD).
October 29, 2018 Filing 37 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Viad Corporation.(Sparks, J)
October 29, 2018 Filing 36 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Incorporated identifying State Street Bank and Trust Company as a Corporate Parent. (Sparks, J) *Modified to reflect document has incorrect case number on 10/30/2018 (DXD).
October 29, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Honeywell International Incorporated, Morgan Engineering Incorporated. (DXD)
October 29, 2018 Filing 34 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California.(Murphy, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal Union Carbide Corporation by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Compton, Andrew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 32 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Morgan Engineering Incorporated.(Mear, Richard) *Modified to reflect incorrect case caption. Attorney notified on 10/29/2018 (DXD).
October 26, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Honeywell International Incorporated.(Sparks, J) *Modified to reflect incorrect case caption. Attorney notified on 10/29/2018 (DXD).
October 26, 2018 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants filed by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Superior Court Order re Amended Complaint)(Compton, Andrew) *Modified to reflect caption incorrect. Attorney notified on 10/29/2018 (DXD).
October 26, 2018 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John) *Modified record on 10/29/2018 (DXD).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/26/2018. (REK)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Stipulation #24 is granted. Defendants Crane Co., Ingersoll-Rand Company, IMO Industries Inc., and Warren Pumps LLC may have up to and including November 5, 2018 to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/26/2018. (REK)
October 25, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Roberts, Daniel) *Modified text on 10/26/2018 (DXD).
October 25, 2018 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Roberts, Daniel) *Modified text on 10/26/2018 (DXD).
October 25, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) by Crane Company, IMO Industries Incorporated, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
October 25, 2018 Filing 23 Additional Attachments to Main Document Service List re: #22 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #21 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Hendricks, John) *Modified text on 10/26/2018 (DXD).
October 25, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Velan, Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation. (Hendricks, John)
October 25, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #2 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand (First Amended Complaint) by Velan Valve Corporation.(Hendricks, John) *Modified linkage on 10/26/2018 (DXD).
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - The Clerk shall terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 12/4/2018. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/25/18. (DXD)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-3339-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California identifying Corporate Parent Icahn Enterprises LP, Corporate Parent IEP Auto Parts Holding, Other Affiliate Carl C Icahn for Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viad Corporation identifying BlackRock Incorporated as Other Affiliate. (Sparks, J) *Modified text on 10/22/2018 (DXD).
October 19, 2018 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. That this Case is Reassigned by Random Draw to Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle for all further proceedings. All future filings in this case should now list the following case number: CV-18-03339-PHX-JZB. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 10/19/18. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Crane Company, Viad Corporation. (DXD)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AutoZone West LLC, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated, General Electric Company, Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California, Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation. (MFR)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #4 Joinder. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Joinder re: #2 Notice of Removal filed by CBS Corporation by Defendant Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 part 3, #6 Exhibit 3 part 4, #7 Exhibit 4)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 Joinder re: #2 Notice of Removal in CBS Corporation's Notice of Removal by Defendant Viad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sparks, J) *Modified linkage on 10/19/2018 (DXD).
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16088456. This case has been assigned to the Honorable H Russel Holland. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-3339-PHX-HRH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
October 17, 2018 ***State Court record received on 10/17/18*** ANSWER to Original Complaint by AutoZone West LLC (Filed in State Court on 9/26/18), Velan Valve Corporation (Filed in State Court on 9/27/18), Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated, General Electric Company, Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated (Filed in State Court on 10/8/18), Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California (Filed in State Court on 10/9/18), Union Carbide Corporation (Filed in State Court on 10/15/18). ***Docketed in US District Court on 10/17/18 for case management purposes.***(MFR) *Modified linkage/text/add answering party on 10/26/2018 (DXD).
October 17, 2018 ***State Court record received on 10/17/18*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, AutoZone West LLC, Cameron International Corporation, Caterpillar Incorporated, Caterpillar Global Mining LLC, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Flowserve US Incorporated and FMC Corporation on 9/17/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/8/18); General Electric Company on 9/17/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/9/18); Ingersoll-Rand Company, ITT Corporation, J.T. Thorpe & Son and Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated on 9/17/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/11/18); O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores LLC, Pennzoil-Quaker State Company, Pep-Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California, Pfizer Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Viad Corporation and Terex Corporation on 9/17/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/12/18); Crane Company, CBS Corporation, Elliott Company, and Freeport-McMoRan Sierrita Incorporated on 9/18/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/8/18); Gardner Denver Incorporated on 9/18/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/9/18); IMO Industries Incorporated, Link-Belt Cranes LP LLP, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Goulds Pumps Incorporated and Honeywell International on 9/18/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/11/2018); Warran Pumps LLC, Velvan Valve Corporation and Phelps Dodge Industries on 9/18/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/12/2018); Air & Liquid Systems Corporation on 9/20/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/8/18); William Powell Company on 9/20/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/12/18); Morgan Engineering Incorporated on 9/21/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/12/18). ***Docketed in US District Court on 10/17/18 for case management purposes.*** (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. *Modified to correct docket text on 10/19/2018 (MFR). *Modified text on 10/22/2018 (DXD).
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation. (Bressler, Stephen) (MFR)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-096382. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16088456 filed by CBS Corporation. (Bressler, Stephen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Incorporated
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Engineering Incorporated
Represented By: Tyler Brandon Sankey
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Heather Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Daniel Geary Roberts
Represented By: Jeremy Arian Lite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California
Represented By: Robert S Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Thomas A Maraz
Represented By: Hannah Hatch Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated
Represented By: Amanda Emily Heitz
Represented By: William Francis Auther
Represented By: Cameron Aaron Arthur
Represented By: David T Lundmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Incorporated
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Heather Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas A Maraz
Represented By: Hannah Hatch Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas A Maraz
Represented By: Hannah Hatch Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Incorporated
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Geary Roberts
Represented By: Jeremy Arian Lite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Karl Michael Tilleman
Represented By: Alexander James Egbert
Represented By: Jason Daniel Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Global Mining LLC
Represented By: Kevin Karl Broerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrush Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries LLC
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Joseph Stuart Pevsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennzoil-Quaker State Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Represented By: Karen Nicole Wohlgemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Incorporated
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Represented By: Lindsey Christine Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone West LLC
Represented By: Carol Marie Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNally Industries LLC
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrol Incorporated
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobcat Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennzoil-Quaker State Company sued individually and as formerly doing business as Esperanza Mine successor in interest Duval Corporation formerly known as Pennzoil Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company formerly known as Elliott Turbomachinery Company doing business as Elliott Turbomachinery Company
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Company
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH America LLC
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&H Mining Equipment Incorporated
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Represented By: Karen Nicole Wohlgemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Incorporated
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Represented By: Lindsey Christine Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company sued as successor to Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company formerly doing business as Esperanza Mine
Represented By: Thomas A Maraz
Represented By: Hannah Hatch Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries LLC formerly doing business as Gardner-Denver Industrial Machinery
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP formerly doing business as Link-Belt Construction Equipment Company LP LLLP
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Fire Apparatus Company
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Nathan Boyd Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Represented By: Lindsey Christine Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennzoil Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC sued individually and as successor in interest CSK Auto Incorporated doing business as Checkers Auto Parts
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dial Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Cameron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated sued individually and as doing business as Cyprus Sierrita Corporation formerly doing business as Esperanza Mine successor in interest Cyprus Sierrita Corporation
Represented By: Thomas A Maraz
Represented By: Hannah Hatch Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Corporation sued individualy and as formerly doing business as Esperanza Mine successor in interest Pennzoil United Incorporated successor in interest Duval Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill
Represented By: Amanda Emily Heitz
Represented By: William Francis Auther
Represented By: Cameron Aaron Arthur
Represented By: David T Lundmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone West Incorporated
Represented By: Carol Marie Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Freeport-McMoran Copper & Gold Incorporated formerly doing business as Esperanza Mine doing business as Cyprus Sierrita Corporation
Represented By: Thomas A Maraz
Represented By: Hannah Hatch Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Joseph Stuart Pevsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Equipment Company doing business as Bobcat Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus-Erie Company
Represented By: Kevin Karl Broerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Brewer
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Represented By: Andrew Compton
Represented By: Andrew B Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?