Innovative Health Technologies Limited v. Crawford et al
Plaintiff: NZ Innovative Health Technologies Limited and Innovative Health Technologies (NZ) Limited
Defendant: Charles Crawford, Michael OBrien, Unknown Obrien, Unknown Crawford, Charles Crawford Husband doing business as ZenSleep and Michael OBrien Husband doing business as ZenSleep
Case Number: 2:2018cv03372
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for James M McCarthy on behalf of the plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY ORDER - Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than January 17, 2019. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 17, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See document for complete details).. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/24/18. (SLQ)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Innovative Health Technologies (NZ) Limited. (Morgan, Christian)
October 22, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Christian Morgan and Joseph T Kucala Jr on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO121)(BAC)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Charles Crawford, Unknown Crawford, Michael OBrien, Unknown Obrien. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16097275. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03372-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by NZ Innovative Health Technologies Limited. (Speth, Maria) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAC)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NZ Innovative Health Technologies Limited. (BAC)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16097275 filed by NZ Innovative Health Technologies Limited.(Speth, Maria) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Health Technologies Limited v. Crawford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael OBrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Obrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Crawford Husband doing business as ZenSleep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael OBrien Husband doing business as ZenSleep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NZ Innovative Health Technologies Limited
Represented By: Christian Stephan Morgan
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Kucala, Jr.
Represented By: James M McCarthy
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Health Technologies (NZ) Limited
Represented By: Christian Stephan Morgan
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Kucala, Jr.
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: James Michael McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?